This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 06/01/2020 at 11:11:20 (UTC).

LAPINE FAMILY VS GARRISON PROP

Case Summary

On 11/20/2019 LAPINE FAMILY filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against GARRISON PROP. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DAVID E. SILVERMAN. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    11/20/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Brevard County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DAVID E. SILVERMAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

KEYSER DONALD

LAPINE FAMILY CHIROPRACTIC CLINIC INC

Defendant

GARRISON PROPERTY CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

200 E Gaines St, C/O Florida Chief Financial Officer Ra

Tallahassee, FL 32399-4201

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HOAG ROBERT D

940 S Harbor City Blvd

Melbourne, FL 32901-1909

Defendant Attorneys

JAFFE ANDREW B

315 E Robinson St Ste 550

Orlando, FL 32801-1631

MANCINI ANGELO

7380 W Sand Lake Rd Ste 600

Orlando, FL 32819-5259

WRIGHT MIKHAL

315 E Robinson St Ste 550

Orlando, FL 32801-1631

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE CASE

01/22/2020: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE CASE

STIPULATION TO SUBSTITUTE ATTORNEY

01/21/2020: STIPULATION TO SUBSTITUTE ATTORNEY

MOTION TO INVOKE RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE

01/03/2020: MOTION TO INVOKE RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

01/03/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

01/03/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

12/16/2019: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

12/05/2019: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA) ISSUED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-MAIL

11/21/2019: SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA) ISSUED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-MAIL

NOTICE OF ATTORNEY DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

11/20/2019: NOTICE OF ATTORNEY DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

11/20/2019: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

11/20/2019: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

SMALL CLAIMS STATEMENT OF CLAIM

11/20/2019: SMALL CLAIMS STATEMENT OF CLAIM

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/30/2020
  • Docket(#17) ORDER SUBSTITUTING ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketORIGINAL DISPOSITION UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) STIPULATION TO SUBSTITUTE ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • Docket(#14) MOTION FOR EXTENSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • Docket(#13) MOTION FOR EXTENSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MOTION TO INVOKE RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • HearingPast Court Schedule: Time: 09:00 AM; Judge: DAVID E. SILVERMAN; Matter Type: PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE; Result: CR: PRETRIAL CONF CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 11/20/2019
  • DocketORIGINAL FILING UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • DocketASM: ISSUE COUNTY SUMMONS; Amount: 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • DocketASM: SMALL CLAIMS > 2501-5000; Amount: 300.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ATTORNEY DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • Docket(#4) REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) SMALL CLAIMS STATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: SMALL CLAIMS; Judge: DAVID E. SILVERMAN; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less