Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 02/24/2021 at 14:49:01 (UTC).

LAPINE FAMILY VS ALLSTATE

Case Summary

On 01/23/2020 LAPINE FAMILY filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ALLSTATE. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHELLE A BAKER. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    01/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Brevard County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MICHELLE A BAKER

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BOYER MARLEE RAE

LAPINE FAMILY CHIROPRACTIC CLINIC INC

BAYSIDE LAKES FAMILY CHIROPRACTIC CLINIC INC

Defendant

ALLSTATE INDEMNITY COMPANY

200 E Gaines St, Co Florida Chief Financial Officer Ra

Tallahassee, FL 32399-4201

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HOAG ROBERT D

940 S Harbor City Blvd

Melbourne, FL 32901-1909

Defendant Attorney

LAMONTAGNE RACHEL M

200 S Biscayne Blvd Ste 4100

Miami, FL 33131-2398

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE CASE

03/25/2020: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE CASE

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

02/24/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

02/24/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA) ISSUED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-MAIL

01/28/2020: SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA) ISSUED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-MAIL

NOTICE OF ATTORNEY DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

01/23/2020: NOTICE OF ATTORNEY DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

01/23/2020: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

01/23/2020: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

01/23/2020: COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • DocketORIGINAL DISPOSITION UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • Docket(#11) MOTION FOR EXTENSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • Docket(#10) MOTION TO DISMISS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • HearingPast Court Schedule: Time: 01:30 PM; Judge: MICHELLE A BAKER; Matter Type: PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE; Result: CR: PRETRIAL CONF CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • DocketPTC CANCELLED PER AO 20-01-B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • DocketCR: PRETRIAL CONF CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • DocketCAL:PRETRIAL CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketORIGINAL FILING UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketASM: ISSUE COUNTY SUMMONS; Amount: 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketASM: SMALL CLAIMS $100 - $500; Amount: 80.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ATTORNEY DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • Docket(#4) REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: SMALL CLAIMS; Judge: MICHELLE A BAKER; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BAYSIDE LAKES FAMILY CHIROPRACTIC CLINIC INC is a litigant

Latest cases where LAPINE FAMILY CHIROPRACTIC CLINIC INC is a litigant

Latest cases where Allstate Indemnity Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LAMONTAGNE , RACHEL M