Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 02/24/2021 at 17:46:40 (UTC).

LAKE WALES VS ANA FORTUNA

Case Summary

On 01/31/2020 LAKE WALES filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ANA FORTUNA. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DAVID E. SILVERMAN. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Brevard County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DAVID E. SILVERMAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

LAKE WALES HOSPITAL CORPORATION

1980 Michigan Ave

Cocoa, FL 32922-5729

LAKE WALES MEDICAL CENTER

1980 Michigan Ave

Cocoa, FL 32922-5729

Defendant

FORTUNA ANA

Palm Bay, FL 32905-5938

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LOTANE TROY R

1980 Michigan Ave

Cocoa, FL 32922-5729

 

Court Documents

CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

08/04/2020: CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

FINAL JUDGMENT RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS

08/04/2020: FINAL JUDGMENT RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS

AFFIDAVIT OF DEFAULT IN PAYMENT STIPULATION

06/25/2020: AFFIDAVIT OF DEFAULT IN PAYMENT STIPULATION

ORDER CANCELLING HEARING OR TRIAL

04/01/2020: ORDER CANCELLING HEARING OR TRIAL

SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR SERVED

02/18/2020: SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR SERVED

SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA) ISSUED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-MAIL

02/04/2020: SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA) ISSUED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-MAIL

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

01/31/2020: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

SMALL CLAIMS STATEMENT OF CLAIM

01/31/2020: SMALL CLAIMS STATEMENT OF CLAIM

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) FINAL JUDGMENT RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • DocketALL REOPEN COMPL EVENTS CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • HearingPast Court Schedule: Time: 09:00 AM; Judge: DAVID E. SILVERMAN; Matter Type: PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE; Result: CR: PRETRIAL CONF CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • DocketCR: PRETRIAL CONF CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • DocketCAL:PRETRIAL CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • ChargeComplaints: Cause of Action: AFFIDAVIT OF DEFAULT PAYMENT STIPULATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • ChargeComplaints: Cause of Action: REOPEN:SMALL CLAIMS UP TO 5000; Disposition Date: 08/04/2020; Disposition Description: CIV/FAM-ALL REOPEN EVNT CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) AFFIDAVIT OF DEFAULT IN PAYMENT STIPULATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • Docket(#7) MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 02/05/2020
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: S163320; Party: P 1; Event Description: PMT: ISSUE COUNTY SUMMONS; Amount: $10.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: TROY R LOTANE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: S163320; Party: P 1; Event Description: PMT: SMALL CLAIMS 501 < 1000; Amount: $175.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: TROY R LOTANE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA) ISSUED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: SMALL CLAIMS; Judge: DAVID E. SILVERMAN; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • ChargeComplaints: Cause of Action: OTHER NEGLIGENCE $501 -$1000; Disposition Date: 04/20/2020; Disposition Description: DISMISSED BEFORE HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketORIGINAL FILING UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketASM: ISSUE COUNTY SUMMONS; Amount: 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketASM: SMALL CLAIMS 501 < 1000; Amount: 175.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) SMALL CLAIMS STATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LAKE WALES MEDICAL CENTER is a litigant

Latest cases where LAKE WALES HOSPITAL CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lotane, Troy R