This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 05/29/2020 at 09:48:33 (UTC).

L PARKER III VS CITY MELBOURNE

Case Summary

On 11/25/2019 L PARKER III filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against CITY MELBOURNE. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DAVID DUGAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    11/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Brevard County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DAVID DUGAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PARKER LARRY III

Defendant

MELBOURNE CITY

Melbourne City Hall, 900 E Strawbridge Ave

Melbourne, FL 32901-4779

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

VAUGHN MICHAEL R

20 N Orange Ave Ste 1600

Orlando, FL 32801-4624

Defendant Attorney

PENDLEY F SCOTT

P O Box 2928

Orlando, FL 32802

 

Court Documents

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

05/05/2020: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

05/05/2020: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

03/19/2020: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

02/19/2020: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

12/23/2019: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

12/23/2019: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

12/04/2019: RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

11/27/2019: SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

11/25/2019: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

NOTICE OF ATTORNEY DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

11/25/2019: NOTICE OF ATTORNEY DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

11/25/2019: COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/12/2020
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL SETTLEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2020
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • Docket(#10) RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • Docket(#6) MOTION TO DISMISS

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 12/02/2019
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: S158171; Party: P 1; Event Description: PMT: CIRCUIT CIVIL FILING FEE; Amount: $401.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: ROBERT DAVID HOAG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • ChargeComplaints: Cause of Action: AUTO NEGLIGENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketORIGINAL FILING UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketASM: ISSUE CIRCUIT SUMMONS; Amount: 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketASM: CIRCUIT CIVIL FILING FEE; Amount: 401.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF ATTORNEY DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: AUTO NEGLIGENCE; Judge: DAVID DUGAN; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less