This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 08/24/2020 at 10:42:47 (UTC).

KEVIN USRY VS PROGRESSIVE

Case Summary

On 01/31/2020 KEVIN USRY filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against PROGRESSIVE. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DAVID E. SILVERMAN. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Brevard County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DAVID E. SILVERMAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

KEVIN USRY DC LLC

PIPMAN RANDY

Defendant

PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MCCORMICK PHILIP A

2210 Central Ave Ste 300

Saint Petersburg, FL 33712-1257

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE CASE

02/21/2020: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE CASE

SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA) ISSUED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-MAIL

02/05/2020: SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA) ISSUED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-MAIL

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

01/31/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

01/31/2020: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

01/31/2020: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

01/31/2020: COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/22/2020
  • HearingPast Court Schedule: Time: 09:00 AM; Judge: DAVID E. SILVERMAN; Matter Type: PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE; Result: CR: PRETRIAL CONF CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • DocketCR: PRETRIAL CONF CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • DocketCAL:PRETRIAL CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • DocketORIGINAL DISPOSITION UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE OF ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2020
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: S163427; Party: P 1; Event Description: PMT: ISSUE COUNTY SUMMONS; Amount: $10.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: SHUSTER SABEN LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2020
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: S163427; Party: P 1; Event Description: PMT: SMALL CLAIMS < 100; Amount: $55.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: SHUSTER SABEN LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA) ISSUED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • ChargeComplaints: Cause of Action: CONTRACT & INDEBTEDNESS; Disposition Date: 02/21/2020; Disposition Description: DISMISSED BEFORE HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketORIGINAL FILING UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketASM: ISSUE COUNTY SUMMONS; Amount: 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketASM: SMALL CLAIMS < 100; Amount: 55.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • Docket(#2) REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: SMALL CLAIMS; Judge: DAVID E. SILVERMAN; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less