This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 08/05/2020 at 10:49:46 (UTC).

KENEMUTH FAMILY VS DIRECT

Case Summary

On 01/22/2020 KENEMUTH FAMILY filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against DIRECT. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHELLE A BAKER. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    01/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Brevard County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MICHELLE A BAKER

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

KENEMUTH FAMILY CHIROPRACTIC INC

TRUSLER RALF

Defendant

DIRECT GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

200 E Gaines St, Co Florida Chief Financial Officer Ra

Tallahassee, FL 32399-4201

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HOAG ROBERT D

940 S Harbor City Blvd

Melbourne, FL 32901-1909

Defendant Attorney

LIEBGOLD MICHAEL

5907 Hampton Oaks Pkwy Ste E

Tampa, FL 33610-9577

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE CASE

03/02/2020: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE CASE

PRIVILEGE LOG

02/24/2020: PRIVILEGE LOG

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

02/24/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

02/24/2020: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA) ISSUED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-MAIL

01/27/2020: SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA) ISSUED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-MAIL

NOTICE OF ATTORNEY DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

01/22/2020: NOTICE OF ATTORNEY DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

01/22/2020: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

01/22/2020: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

01/22/2020: COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/03/2020
  • HearingPast Court Schedule: Time: 01:30 PM; Judge: MICHELLE A BAKER; Matter Type: PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE; Result: CR: PRETRIAL CONF CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • DocketCR: PRETRIAL CONF CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • DocketCAL:PRETRIAL CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • DocketORIGINAL DISPOSITION UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • DocketPTC CANCELLED PER AO 20-01-B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) PRIVILEGE LOG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • Docket(#11) RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • Docket(#10) RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketORIGINAL FILING UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketASM: ISSUE COUNTY SUMMONS; Amount: 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketASM: SMALL CLAIMS 501 < 1000; Amount: 175.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ATTORNEY DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • Docket(#4) REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: SMALL CLAIMS; Judge: MICHELLE A BAKER; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less