This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 02/23/2020 at 16:05:57 (UTC).

KELLEY SWEENIE VS AMBER DEESON

Case Summary

On 06/28/2019 KELLEY SWEENIE filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against AMBER DEESON. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHELLE NABERHAUS. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    06/28/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Court:

    Brevard County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MICHELLE NABERHAUS

 

Party Details

Petitioner

SWEENEY KELLEY ANNE

Palm Bay, FL 32907-8218

Respondent

DEESON AMBER RENEE

Palm Bay, FL 32907-8218

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/11/2019
  • HearingPast Court Schedule: Time: 08:30 AM; Judge: MICHELLE NABERHAUS; Matter Type: INJUNCTION HEARING; Result: CR: INJUNCTION HRG HEARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • DocketCR: INJUNCTION HRG HEARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • DocketCAL:INJUNCTION HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • Docket(#12) TEMPORARY INJUNCTION RETURNED SERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • DocketORIGINAL DISPOSITION UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • Docket(#11) ORDER DISSOLVING INJUNCTION FOR PROTECTION RECORDED IN OFFICIAL RECORDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • Docket(#10) MOTION TO DISSOLVE INJUNCTION FOR PROTECTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • ChargeComplaints: Cause of Action: DOMESTIC VIOLENCE W/O CHILDREN; Disposition Date: 07/02/2019; Disposition Description: DISPOSED BY JUDGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • Docket(#9) TEMPORARY INJUNCTION ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • Docket(#8) TEMPORARY INJUNCTION AND NOTICE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • Docket(#7) PETITIONERS WAIVER OR NON WAIVER OF RETURN HEARING WITH AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • Docket(#6) AFFIDAVIT OF CLERK REGARDING SEARCH OF RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • Docket(#4) PETITION FOR INJUNCTION FOR PROTECTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • Docket(#3) COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • Docket(#2) MEMORANDUM TO LAW ENFORCEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • Docket(#1) ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • DocketFEE EXEMPT: NO FEE AUTHORIZED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • DocketORIGINAL FILING UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: DOMESTIC VIOLENCE W/O CHILDREN; Judge: MICHELLE NABERHAUS; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less