This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 06/06/2020 at 10:29:00 (UTC).

KAREN LYDAY VS COUNTRY BINGO

Case Summary

On 11/25/2019 KAREN LYDAY filed an Other lawsuit against COUNTRY BINGO. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DAVID DUGAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    11/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Brevard County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DAVID DUGAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LYDAY KAREN

Defendant

COUNTRY BINGO INC

Maurice Arcadier Registered Agent, 2815 W New Haven Ave Ste 304

Melbourne, FL 32904-3655

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LINDBAEK CHRISTIAN A

222 N Harbor City Blvd

Melbourne, FL 32935-6762

Defendant Attorney

KOBY SHAUN

4350 W Cypress St Ste 910

Tampa, FL 33607-4181

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

05/06/2020: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITION

05/04/2020: NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITION

NOTICE OR CERTIFICATE OF NON-OBJECTION

04/20/2020: NOTICE OR CERTIFICATE OF NON-OBJECTION

NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY

04/07/2020: NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY

NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY

04/07/2020: NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

03/13/2020: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

03/10/2020: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

03/04/2020: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

02/17/2020: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

02/17/2020: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

02/03/2020: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

AMENDED COMPLAINT

01/24/2020: AMENDED COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

01/07/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

12/05/2019: RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

11/27/2019: SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

11/25/2019: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

COMPLAINT OR PETITION

11/25/2019: COMPLAINT OR PETITION

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/06/2020
  • Docket(#26) AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) NOTICE OR CERTIFICATE OF NON-OBJECTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • Docket(#20) AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • Docket(#17) RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 12/02/2019
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: S158216; Party: P 1; Event Description: PMT: CIRCUIT CIVIL FILING FEE; Amount: $401.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: GILLIN GILLIN LINDBAEK PA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • ChargeComplaints: Cause of Action: PREMISES LIABILITY COMMERCIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketORIGINAL FILING UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketASM: ISSUE CIRCUIT SUMMONS; Amount: 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketASM: CIRCUIT CIVIL FILING FEE; Amount: 401.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT OR PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: PREMISES LIABILITY COMMERCIAL; Judge: DAVID DUGAN; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less