This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 11/28/2020 at 11:31:08 (UTC).

K ROSS VS J DICKSON

Case Summary

On 09/17/2020 K ROSS filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against J DICKSON. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are C ROBERTS-GM K ERLENBACH and CHARLES J ROBERTS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    09/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Court:

    Brevard County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

C ROBERTS-GM K ERLENBACH

CHARLES J ROBERTS

 

Party Details

Petitioner

ROSS KECIA AMBROSIA

Knoxville, TN 37921-2611

Respondent

DICKSON JACQUEKIE

Palm Bay, FL 32905-3253

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

ALBERT JOHN JOSEPH

6032 Farcenda Pl Ste 101

Melbourne, FL 32940-7341

Respondent Attorney

BURNS ERICA G

2886 S Osceola Ave

Orlando, FL 32806-5431

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/11/2020
  • Docket(#10) MOTION TO COMPEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • Docket(#9) ORDER DENYING PETITION OR MOTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • HearingPast Court Schedule: Time: 09:30 AM; Judge: CHARLES J ROBERTS; Matter Type: HEARING; Result: CR: HEARING HEARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • DocketCR: HEARING HEARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • DocketCAL:HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • ChargeComplaints: Cause of Action: OTHER DOMESTIC RELATIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: V618233; Party: PT 1; Memo: DPP START; Event Description: PMT: CIR CV DEFER PMT FEE CLK; Amount: $25.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: ROSS KECIA AMBROSIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • Docket(#5) CIVIL APPLICATION FOR INDIGENT STATUS - FOUND NOT INDIGENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • Docket(#4) CIVIL REQUEST APPROVING PAYMENT AGREEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • Docket(#3) AFFIDAVIT REGARDING JUVENILE DEPENDENCY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • Docket(#2) UNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY JURISDICTION AFFIDAVIT (UCCJA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • Docket(#1) PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • DocketORIGINAL FILING UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • DocketASM: CIRCUIT CIVIL FILING FEE; Amount: 401.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • DocketASM: CIR CV DEFER PMT FEE CLK; Amount: 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: OTHER FAMILY COURT; Judge: C ROBERTS-GM K ERLENBACH; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less