This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 02/25/2021 at 14:59:03 (UTC).

K DUTTENHAVER VS W DUTTENHAVER

Case Summary

On 03/13/2020 K DUTTENHAVER filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against W DUTTENHAVER. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DAVID E. SILVERMAN. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    03/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DAVID E. SILVERMAN

 

Party Details

Petitioner

DUTTENHAVER KAYLA RENE

Mims, FL 32754-5011

Respondent

DUTTENHAVER WILLIAM PARKER

Mims, FL 32754-5011

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/29/2020
  • Docket(#13) INCOME DEDUCTION ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • HearingPast Court Schedule: Time: 11:00 AM; Judge: DAVID E. SILVERMAN; Matter Type: HEARING; Result: CR: HEARING CANCELLED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • DocketCR: HEARING CANCELLED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • DocketCAL:HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • DocketPMT: VS CLERKS DSB; Amount: -5.99

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • DocketPMT: VS CLERKS DSB FEE; Amount: -4.51

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • DocketPMT: CIVIL SUSPENSE; Amount: 10.50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • DocketVITAL STATISTIC FORM GENERATED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • HearingPast Court Schedule: Time: 10:45 AM; Judge: DAVID E. SILVERMAN; Matter Type: HEARING; Result: CR: HEARING HEARD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • Docket(#12) AGREEMENT RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 03/13/2020
  • ChargeComplaints: Cause of Action: DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE; Disposition Date: 05/29/2020; Disposition Description: DISPOSED BY JUDGE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • DocketORIGINAL FILING UPDATED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • DocketASM: DOM FILING FEE; Amount: 409.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • DocketRSGN: DOM TO COUNTY COURT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • Docket(#4) DOMESTIC RELATIONS FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • Docket(#3) COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • Docket(#2) ANSWER AND WAIVER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • Docket(#1) PETITION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE; Judge: DAVID E. SILVERMAN; Description: RSGN: DOM TO COUNTY COURT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE; Judge: R SEGAL-GM K ERLENBACH; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less