Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 04/16/2020 at 04:34:09 (UTC).

K CRAWFORD VS STEVAN KELLY JR

Case Summary

On 04/20/2017 K CRAWFORD filed a Property - Construction Defect lawsuit against STEVAN KELLY JR. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are JAMES H EARP and CHARLES J ROBERTS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    04/20/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Construction Defect

  • Court:

    Brevard County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

JAMES H EARP

CHARLES J ROBERTS

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

PESANT GILLES

CRAWFORD KIMBERLY

Defendants

KELLY STEVAN JR

Melbourne, FL 32904-2217

LEED INSULATION

FLORIDA BREEZE

Melbourne, FL 32904-2217

TURNKEY CONSTRUCTION PLANNERS INC

658 Atlantis Rd Ste 102

Melbourne, FL 32904-2342

MER ENTERPRISES LLC

7332 Commercial Cir

Fort Pierce, FL 34951-4109

KELLY KRISTIN

Melbourne, FL 32904-2217

STANLEY HOMES INC

2087 Sarno Rd

Melbourne, FL 32935-3085

RES INVESTMENTS LLC

700 N Wickham Rd Ste 209, C/O Robert Stitzel

Melbourne, FL 32935-8840

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GELFAND SCOTT N

5491 North University Drive Suite 204

Coral Springs, FL 33067-4645

Defendant Attorneys

COSBY JEFFREY C

301 Se Ocean Blvd, Ste 205

Stuart, FL 34994-

POPRAWSKI SEBASTIAN KAZIMIERZ

301 Se Ocean Blvd Ste 205

Stuart, FL 34994-2209

MACKINNON R GAVIN

20 N Orange Ave Ste 1207

Orlando, FL 32801-4657

BAUMANN GARY F

1401 E Broward Blvd Ste 200

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301-2100

TELLES JONATHAN

1401 E Broward Blvd Ste 200

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301-2100

PARK HOUSTON S III

303 Banyan Blvd Ste 300

West Palm Beach, FL 33401-4607

VANDER KOLK KEVIN J

4400 Marsh Landing Blvd Ste 4

Ponte Vedra Beach, FL 32082-1287

FIORELLO MATTHEW A

1550 Southern Blvd

West Palm Beach, FL 33406-3240

SMITH CLARK W

1615 Forum Pl #500

West Palm Beach, FL 33401

ANDERSON GREGORY A

4400 Marsh Landing Blvd Ste 4

Ponte Vedra Beach, FL 32082-1287

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OR CERTIFICATE OF NON-OBJECTION

10/01/2019: NOTICE OR CERTIFICATE OF NON-OBJECTION

AGREED ORDER

08/30/2019: AGREED ORDER

NOTICE OR CERTIFICATE OF NON-OBJECTION

08/27/2019: NOTICE OR CERTIFICATE OF NON-OBJECTION

REQUEST FOR COPIES

07/10/2019: REQUEST FOR COPIES

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

07/02/2019: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

NOTICE OF FILING

02/05/2019: NOTICE OF FILING

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

03/15/2018: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY

08/11/2017: NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY

ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

07/24/2017: ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

NOTICE OR CERTIFICATE OF NON-OBJECTION

10/01/2019: NOTICE OR CERTIFICATE OF NON-OBJECTION

NOTICE OF INTENT TO SERVE SUBPOENA

06/25/2019: NOTICE OF INTENT TO SERVE SUBPOENA

REQUEST FOR COPIES

06/17/2019: REQUEST FOR COPIES

REQUEST FOR COPIES

10/16/2018: REQUEST FOR COPIES

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS

06/26/2018: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS

MOTION TO STRIKE

03/22/2018: MOTION TO STRIKE

NOTICE OF HEARING

02/22/2018: NOTICE OF HEARING

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

12/14/2017: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

09/05/2017: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

92 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#201) NOTICE OF CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE WITH REQUEST FOR COPIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • Docket(#200) NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • Docket(#199) AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketRSGN: CASELOAD REASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: CONSTRUCTION DEFECT; Judge: PRESIDING JUDGE DIVISION T; Description: RSGN: CASELOAD REASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#198) NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • Docket(#197) MOTION TO COMPEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#196) NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • Docket(#195) NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#194) AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

    Read MoreRead Less
225 More Docket Entries
  • 04/20/2017
  • ChargeComplaints: Cause of Action: CONSTRUCTION DEFECT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2017
  • DocketORIGINAL FILING UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2017
  • DocketASM: ISSUE CIRCUIT SUMMONS; Amount: 30.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2017
  • DocketASM: CIRCUIT CIVIL FILING FEE; Amount: 401.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2017
  • Docket(#2) COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2017
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2017
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2017
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT OR PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2017
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: CONSTRUCTION DEFECT; Judge: CHARLES J ROBERTS; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MER ENTERPRISES LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ANDERSON GREGORY A

Latest cases represented by Lawyer POPRAWSKI SEBASTIAN KAZIMIERZ

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FIORELLO, MATTHEW ANTHONY