This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 05/09/2022 at 12:31:59 (UTC).

K ARSENAULT VS ADAMS HOMES

Case Summary

On 06/29/2021 K ARSENAULT filed a Property - Construction Defect lawsuit against ADAMS HOMES. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GEORGE T PAULK. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    06/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Construction Defect

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GEORGE T PAULK

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ARSENAULT KEVIN E

ARSENAULT MICHELE L

Defendants

ADAMS HOMES NORTHWEST FLORIDA INC

C/O Wayne L Adams Ra, 3000 Gulf Breeze Pkwy

Gulf Breeze, FL 32563-5623

EXTERIOR FINISH PLASTERING CORPORATION

315 Sw 72Nd Pl

Ocala, FL 34476-6870

EXTERIOR FINISH PLASTERING LLC

315 Sw 72Nd Pl

Ocala, FL 34476-6870

JASON COUNCELL CONSTRUCTION INC

1909 Wallace Ave

Melbourne, FL 32935-3963

PROBUILD COMPANY LLC

1200 S Pine Island Rd

Plantation, FL 33324-4469

CITY PAINTERS SERVICE LLC

982 Beechfern Ln

Rockledge, FL 32955-4010

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

OBRIEN NEIL PATRICK

777 Alderman Rd

Palm Harbor, FL 34683-2604

Defendant Attorneys

BULLINGER JASON F

Po Box 1873

Oralndo, FL 32802

FRAZIER JOHN M

1990 W New Haven Ave Ste 201

Melbourne, FL 32904-3923

CHILDERS MICHAEL J

201 N Hogan St Ste 400

Jacksonville, FL 32202-4220

TUZZIO GERARD A

7501 Wiles Rd Ste 201

Coral Springs, FL 33067-2063

VRBENSKY JASON B

12276 San Jose Blvd Ste 529

Jacksonville, FL 32223-8673

SHOWEN ANDREW V

390 N Orange Ave Ste 1610

Orlando, FL 32801-1641

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

02/24/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

10/12/2021: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

03/03/2022: RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

01/21/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

10/12/2021: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

08/19/2021: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

09/09/2021: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

07/13/2021: RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

DEFAULT ENTERED

03/07/2022: DEFAULT ENTERED

44 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/25/2022
  • Docket(#74) REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#73) ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#72) ORDER SETTING ASIDE DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • Docket(#71) NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL SETTLEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#70) REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • Docket(#69) NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • Docket(#68) NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#67) REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • Docket(#66) NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#65) REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
78 More Docket Entries
  • 07/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 21-24 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 21-24 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • ChargeComplaints: Cause of Action: CONSTRUCTION DEFECT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketORIGINAL FILING UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketASM: ISSUE CIRCUIT SUMMONS; Amount: 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketASM: CIRCUIT CIVIL FILING FEE; Amount: 401.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: CONSTRUCTION DEFECT; Judge: GEORGE T PAULK; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ADAMS HOMES OF NORTHWEST FLORIDA INC is a litigant

Latest cases where PROBUILD COMPANY LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer OBRIEN NEIL PATRICK