This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 08/04/2020 at 10:38:59 (UTC).

K ANDERSON VS MEGAN BANNON

Case Summary

On 01/31/2020 K ANDERSON filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against MEGAN BANNON. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHELLE A BAKER. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Court:

    Brevard County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MICHELLE A BAKER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ANDERSON KENNETH W

Harrison, GA 31035-7625

Defendants

ANDERSON MEGAN MARIE

Merritt Island, FL 32952-5113

BANNON MEGAN MARIE

Merritt Island, FL 32952-5113

 

Court Documents

WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED SERVED

03/23/2020: WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED SERVED

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED

03/12/2020: WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED

FINAL JUDGMENT OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS

03/10/2020: FINAL JUDGMENT OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS

ORDER SETTING HEARING

02/19/2020: ORDER SETTING HEARING

CLERKS CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT NOT ENTERED

02/18/2020: CLERKS CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT NOT ENTERED

MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK

02/13/2020: MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK

REPLY ANSWER OR RESPONSE

02/10/2020: REPLY ANSWER OR RESPONSE

RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

02/10/2020: RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

SUMMONS ISSUED

01/31/2020: SUMMONS ISSUED

AFFIDAVIT REGARDING MILITARY SERVICE

01/31/2020: AFFIDAVIT REGARDING MILITARY SERVICE

COMPLAINT OR PETITION

01/31/2020: COMPLAINT OR PETITION

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED SERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • HearingPast Court Schedule: Time: 09:15 AM; Judge: MICHELLE A BAKER; Matter Type: HEARING; Result: CR: HEARING HEARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) FINAL JUDGMENT OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • DocketORIGINAL DISPOSITION UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • DocketCR: HEARING HEARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • DocketCAL:HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER SETTING HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CLERKS CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT NOT ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketF/J FWD TO JUDGE FOR REVIEW

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketCV CASE TYPE CHANGE/SRS ONLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketASM: ISSUE COUNTY SUMMONS; Amount: 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketASM: COUNTY CIVIL FILING FEE; Amount: 300.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketORIGINAL FILING UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketMAILING PER FS 48.183/82.05

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) AFFIDAVIT REGARDING MILITARY SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT OR PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: COUNTY EVICTION; Judge: MICHELLE A BAKER; Description: CV CASE TYPE CHANGE/SRS ONLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: OTHER COUNTY CIVIL; Judge: MICHELLE A BAKER; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less