This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 08/08/2020 at 21:17:03 (UTC).

JULIA REYES VS AVATAR PROPERTY

Case Summary

On 01/29/2020 JULIA REYES filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against AVATAR PROPERTY. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DAVID DUGAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    01/29/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Brevard County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DAVID DUGAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

DELGADO JULIO

REYES JULIA

Defendant

AVATAR PROPERTY CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

200 E Gaines St

Tallahassee, FL 32399-4201

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SINGH NEIL V

10100 W Sample Rd Fl 3

Coral Springs, FL 33065-3975

Defendant Attorney

DIAMOND PETER A

4000 Hollywood Blvd Ste 120N

Hollywood, FL 33021-6742

 

Court Documents

PRIVILEGE LOG

06/02/2020: PRIVILEGE LOG

NOTICE FOR JURY TRIAL

05/09/2020: NOTICE FOR JURY TRIAL

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

04/02/2020: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

03/29/2020: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

NOTICE OF ATTORNEY DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

03/27/2020: NOTICE OF ATTORNEY DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

03/27/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

02/03/2020: SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

01/29/2020: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

01/29/2020: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

01/29/2020: COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

01/29/2020: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/09/2020
  • Docket(#26) NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • Docket(#25) NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) PRIVILEGE LOG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • Docket(#23) RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • Docket(#22) RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) NOTICE FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2020
  • Docket(#20) REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2020
  • Docket(#18) MOTION FOR EXTENSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • Docket(#17) PLAINTIFFS EXHIBIT(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 01/29/2020
  • DocketASM: CIRCUIT CIVIL FILING FEE; Amount: 401.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: CONTRACT & INDEBTEDNESS; Judge: DAVID DUGAN; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less