This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 08/04/2020 at 10:39:42 (UTC).

JPMORGAN VS GARY MERCADO

Case Summary

On 01/31/2020 JPMORGAN filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against GARY MERCADO. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GEORGE T PAULK. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Brevard County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GEORGE T PAULK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JPMORGAN CHASE BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

Defendants

MERCADO GARY S

Titusville, FL 32796-3240

FLORIDA HOUSING FINANCE CORPORATION

227 N Bronough St Ste 5000

Tallahassee, FL 32301-1367

UNKNOWN PERSON

Titusville, FL 32796-3240

MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS INC

1200 S Pine Island Rd, C/O Ct Corporation Registered Agent

Plantation, FL 33324-4469

AGUON MELINDA CECIL RABON

Titusville, FL 32796-3240

EQUITY PRIME MORTGAGE LLC

AGUON JASON FRANK

Titusville, FL 32796-3240

AGUON JASON

Titusville, FL 32796-3240

AGUON MELINDA CECIL

Titusville, FL 32796-3240

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KNOPP ERIC

8201 Peters Rd Ste 3000

Plantation, FL 33324-3292

Defendant Attorneys

WAGNER JORDAN

320 Se 18Th St

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33316-2818

JOHNSON KACEE

227 N Bronough St Ste 5000

Tallahassee, FL 32301-1367

SAEED AAMIR

1800 Nw 49Th St Ste 120

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33309-3092

TELEPMAN JAMES S

712 Us Highway 1 Ste 400

North Palm Beach, FL 33408-4596

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

02/05/2020: SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

02/05/2020: SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

01/31/2020: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

01/31/2020: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

01/31/2020: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

01/31/2020: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

NOTICE OF FILING CERTIFICATE OF NOTE IN POSSESSION

01/31/2020: NOTICE OF FILING CERTIFICATE OF NOTE IN POSSESSION

COVER SHEET

01/31/2020: COVER SHEET

LIS PENDENS RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS

01/31/2020: LIS PENDENS RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS

RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

02/11/2020: RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

02/05/2020: SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

02/05/2020: SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

02/05/2020: SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

02/05/2020: SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

01/31/2020: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

01/31/2020: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

COMPLAINT OR PETITION

01/31/2020: COMPLAINT OR PETITION

MORTGAGE CLAIM AMOUNT WORKSHEET

01/31/2020: MORTGAGE CLAIM AMOUNT WORKSHEET

26 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/05/2020
  • HearingCourt Schedule: Court Time: 09:30 AM; Event Description: CAL:HEARING; Court Room Description: TITUSVILLE HISTORIC COURTHOUSE; Judge Name: GEORGE T PAULK; User: ajg90

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • DocketCAL:HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) NOTICE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) MOTION FOR EXTENSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) DEFENDANTS EXHIBIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) MOTION FOR EXTENSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) CERTIFICATE OF MAILING AND/OR SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) ORDER EXTENDING TIME

    Read MoreRead Less
33 More Docket Entries
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) COMPLAINT OR PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF FILING CERTIFICATE OF NOTE IN POSSESSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MORTGAGE CLAIM AMOUNT WORKSHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) LIS PENDENS RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: FCL-NON-HOMESTD 50001-249999; Judge: GEORGE T PAULK; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less