This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 05/07/2022 at 16:32:37 (UTC).

JOSEPH KINNEY VS DONNA KINNEY

Case Summary

On 12/03/2021 JOSEPH KINNEY filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against DONNA KINNEY. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are RHONDA E. BABB and KELLY INGRAM. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    12/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

RHONDA E. BABB

KELLY INGRAM

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KINNEY JOSEPH

Rockledge, FL 32955-3802

Defendant

KINNEY DONNA

Palm Bay, FL 32909-4139

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GOLUB GEOFFREY

512 N Harbor City Blvd

Melbourne, FL 32935-6838

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT OR PETITION

12/03/2021: COMPLAINT OR PETITION

AFFIDAVIT REGARDING MILITARY SERVICE

12/03/2021: AFFIDAVIT REGARDING MILITARY SERVICE

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

12/03/2021: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

NOTICE OF NON-ATTORNEY E-MAIL DESIGNATION

12/03/2021: NOTICE OF NON-ATTORNEY E-MAIL DESIGNATION

LANDLORD CARES ACT INFO SHEET

12/03/2021: LANDLORD CARES ACT INFO SHEET

SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

12/03/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING AND/OR SERVICE

12/13/2021: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING AND/OR SERVICE

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

12/16/2021: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

REPLY ANSWER OR RESPONSE

12/15/2021: REPLY ANSWER OR RESPONSE

MOTION TO DETERMINE AMOUNT DUE

12/15/2021: MOTION TO DETERMINE AMOUNT DUE

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/16/2021
  • DocketRSGN: ATTORNEY/JUDGE CONFLICT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: COUNTY EVICTION; Judge: RHONDA E. BABB; Description: RSGN: ATTORNEY/JUDGE CONFLICT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION TO DETERMINE AMOUNT DUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) REPLY ANSWER OR RESPONSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CERTIFICATE OF MAILING AND/OR SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: S209735; Party: P 1; Memo: EFILING # 139657550; Event Description: PMT: ISSUE COUNTY SUMMONS; Amount: $10.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: KINNEY JOSEPH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: S209735; Party: P 1; Memo: EFILING # 139657550; Event Description: PMT: EVICTION FILING FEE; Amount: $185.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: KINNEY JOSEPH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • ChargeComplaints: Cause of Action: EVICTIONS RESIDENTIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • DocketORIGINAL FILING UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • DocketASM: ISSUE COUNTY SUMMONS; Amount: 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • DocketASM: EVICTION FILING FEE; Amount: 185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) LANDLORD CARES ACT INFO SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF NON-ATTORNEY E-MAIL DESIGNATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) AFFIDAVIT REGARDING MILITARY SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT OR PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: COUNTY EVICTION; Judge: KELLY INGRAM; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer GOLUB GEOFFREY