This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 03/21/2020 at 08:18:59 (UTC).

JOHN CASTNER VS CITIZENS PROP

Case Summary

On 09/16/2019 JOHN CASTNER filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against CITIZENS PROP. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are DAVID DUGAN and PRIVATE CIRCUIT CIV MEDIATION. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    09/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Brevard County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

DAVID DUGAN

PRIVATE CIRCUIT CIV MEDIATION

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CASTNER JOHN

Defendant

CITIZENS PROPERTY INSURANCE CORPORATION

C/O Florida Chief Financial Officer As Ra, 200 E Gaines St

Tallahassee, FL 32399-4201

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

LOW DAVID

2101 W Commercial Blvd Ste 2800

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33309-3070

DEGRACIA SUNNI

2101 West Commercial Boulevard Suite 2800

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33309

Defendant Attorney

KUNDID MICHAEL ANTON

138 Live Oak Ave

Daytona Beach, FL 32114-4912

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF MEDIATION

03/10/2020: NOTICE OF MEDIATION

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

12/20/2019: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

MOTION TO SET MEDIATION

12/18/2019: MOTION TO SET MEDIATION

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

12/02/2019: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

12/02/2019: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM ATTORNEY OF RECORD

11/22/2019: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM ATTORNEY OF RECORD

NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL

11/22/2019: NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL

REPLY ANSWER OR RESPONSE

10/11/2019: REPLY ANSWER OR RESPONSE

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

10/04/2019: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

09/17/2019: SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

09/16/2019: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

09/16/2019: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

09/16/2019: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

09/16/2019: COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

COVER SHEET

09/16/2019: COVER SHEET

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/09/2020
  • HearingCourt Schedule: Court Time: 10:00 AM; Event Description: CAL:PRIVATE CIRCUIT MEDIATION; Court Room Description: AS ORDERED BY THE COURT; Judge Name: PRIVATE CIRCUIT CIV MEDIATION; User: mec84

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • DocketCAL:PRIVATE CIRCUIT MEDIATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) NOTICE OF MEDIATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • Docket(#36) AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • Docket(#35) NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • Docket(#34) NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • Docket(#33) NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL SETTLEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • Docket(#32) RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • Docket(#31) NOTICE OF FILING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • Docket(#30) MOTION FOR EXTENSION

    Read MoreRead Less
27 More Docket Entries
  • 09/16/2019
  • DocketORIGINAL FILING UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • DocketASM: ISSUE CIRCUIT SUMMONS; Amount: 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • DocketASM: CIRCUIT CIVIL FILING FEE; Amount: 401.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: CONTRACT & INDEBTEDNESS; Judge: DAVID DUGAN; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less