This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 08/07/2020 at 07:23:35 (UTC).

JEREMY MUMMERT VS B MUMMERT

Case Summary

On 01/24/2020 JEREMY MUMMERT filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against B MUMMERT. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DAVID E. SILVERMAN. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    01/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Brevard County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DAVID E. SILVERMAN

 

Party Details

Petitioner

MUMMERT JEREMY

Palm Bay, FL 32908-6266

Respondent

MUMMERT BRANDY

Palm Bay, FL 32908-6266

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

THOMPSON JEFFREY G

1329 Bedford Dr Ste 1

Melbourne, FL 32940-

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/10/2020
  • DocketPMT: VS CLERKS DSB; Amount: -5.99

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • DocketPMT: VS CLERKS DSB FEE; Amount: -4.51

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • DocketPMT: CIVIL SUSPENSE; Amount: 10.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • DocketVITAL STATISTIC FORM GENERATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • HearingPast Court Schedule: Time: 11:00 AM; Judge: DAVID E. SILVERMAN; Matter Type: HEARING; Result: CR: HEARING HEARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • DocketORIGINAL DISPOSITION UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • Docket(#13) FINAL JUDGMENT DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • DocketCR: HEARING HEARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • DocketCAL:HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 01/24/2020
  • Docket(#8) COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF FILING CERTIFICATE OF COMPLETION OF PARENT EDUCATION COURSE (COPE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF FILING CERTIFICATE OF COMPLETION OF PARENT EDUCATION COURSE (COPE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • Docket(#4) PARENTING PLAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • Docket(#3) MARITAL SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • Docket(#2) ANSWER AND WAIVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • Docket(#1) PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE; Judge: DAVID E. SILVERMAN; Description: RSGN: DOM TO COUNTY COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE; Judge: C ROBERTS-GM L CASTALDI; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less