This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 04/08/2020 at 10:14:19 (UTC).

JENNIFER CRAIG VS JOHN CRAIG

Case Summary

On 10/04/2019 JENNIFER CRAIG filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against JOHN CRAIG. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are C ROBERTS-GM K SMITH RODRIGUEZ and CHARLES J ROBERTS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Brevard County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

C ROBERTS-GM K SMITH RODRIGUEZ

CHARLES J ROBERTS

 

Party Details

Petitioner

CRAIG JENNIFER ALLISON

Satellite Beach, FL 32937

Respondent

CRAIG JOHN GARLAND

Orlando, FL 32833-3853

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

ECKER TRACY

325 5Th Ave Ste 100

Indialantic, FL 32903-4226

Respondent Attorney

MORRISON CHRISTOPHER H

401 W Fairbanks Ave Ste 100

Winter Park, FL 32789-5002

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/26/2021
  • HearingCourt Schedule: Court Time: 09:00 AM; Event Description: CAL:NON JURY TRIAL; Court Room Description: MOORE JUSTICE CENTER; Judge Name: CHARLES J ROBERTS; User: mec84

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketCAL:NON JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • HearingCourt Schedule: Court Time: 10:15 AM; Event Description: CAL:HEARING; Court Room Description: MOORE JUSTICE CENTER; Judge Name: CHARLES J ROBERTS; User: ajg90

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • DocketCAL:HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • Docket(#33) NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • Docket(#32) NOTICE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • Docket(#29) ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • Docket(#31) ORDER DENYING PETITION OR MOTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • Docket(#30) ORDER ON MOTION TO COMPEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • Docket(#28) AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

    Read MoreRead Less
59 More Docket Entries
  • 10/04/2019
  • DocketIMAGES OF COURT FILE FROM FLORIDA COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • DocketIMAGES OF COURT FILE FROM FLORIDA COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • DocketIMAGES OF COURT FILE FROM FLORIDA COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • DocketIMAGES OF COURT FILE FROM FLORIDA COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • DocketIMAGES OF COURT FILE FROM FLORIDA COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • DocketIMAGES OF COURT FILE FROM FLORIDA COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • Docket(#1) CERTIFIED COPY OF FILE FROM FLORIDA COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • DocketORIGINAL FILING UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • DocketASM: CIRCUIT CIVIL FILING FEE; Amount: 401.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE; Judge: C ROBERTS-GM K SMITH RODRIGUEZ; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less