Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 06/21/2020 at 19:52:27 (UTC).

JEFFERSON VS K M LINDQUIST

Case Summary

On 11/26/2019 JEFFERSON filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against K M LINDQUIST. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BENJAMIN B GARAGOZLO. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    11/26/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Brevard County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BENJAMIN B GARAGOZLO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS LLC

Defendant

LINDQUIST KAREN M

Palm Bay, FL 32909-5014

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TEAL BROOKE E

Po Box 23200

Louisville, KY 40223-0200

 

Court Documents

FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

01/17/2020: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

AFFIDAVIT OF COSTS

01/17/2020: AFFIDAVIT OF COSTS

AFFIDAVIT REGARDING MILITARY SERVICE

01/17/2020: AFFIDAVIT REGARDING MILITARY SERVICE

DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT RECORDED IN OFFICIAL RECORDS

01/17/2020: DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT RECORDED IN OFFICIAL RECORDS

DEFAULT ENTERED

01/16/2020: DEFAULT ENTERED

SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR SERVED

12/19/2019: SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR SERVED

SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA) ISSUED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-MAIL

12/03/2019: SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA) ISSUED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-MAIL

COMPLAINT OR PETITION

11/26/2019: COMPLAINT OR PETITION

COVER SHEET

11/26/2019: COVER SHEET

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

11/26/2019: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) AFFIDAVIT OF COSTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) AFFIDAVIT REGARDING MILITARY SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT RECORDED IN OFFICIAL RECORDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • DocketORIGINAL DISPOSITION UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) DEFAULT ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • HearingPast Court Schedule: Time: 09:00 AM; Judge: BENJAMIN B GARAGOZLO; Matter Type: PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE; Result: CR: DEF FAILED TO APPEAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • DocketCR: DEF FAILED TO APPEAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • DocketCAL:PRETRIAL CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR SERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 12/04/2019
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: S158397; Party: P 1; Event Description: PMT: SMALL CLAIMS > 1501-2500; Amount: $175.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: BROOKE E TEAL ESQ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA) ISSUED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • ChargeComplaints: Cause of Action: CONTRACT & INDEBTEDNESS; Disposition Date: 01/17/2020; Disposition Description: DISPOSED BY DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • DocketORIGINAL FILING UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • DocketASM: ISSUE COUNTY SUMMONS; Amount: 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • DocketASM: SMALL CLAIMS $1501-$2500; Amount: 175.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COMPLAINT OR PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: SMALL CLAIMS; Judge: BENJAMIN B GARAGOZLO; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Jefferson Capital Systems LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer TEAL, BROOKE ELIZABETH