This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 12/02/2021 at 06:46:56 (UTC).

JEFFERSON CAP VS THOMAS CONFE

Case Summary

On 05/11/2021 JEFFERSON CAP filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against THOMAS CONFE. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are JUDITH E ATKIN and KELLY INGRAM. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    05/11/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

JUDITH E ATKIN

KELLY INGRAM

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS LLC

Defendant

CONFER THOMAS E

Melbourne, FL 32935-4874

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TEAL BROOKE E

Po Box 23200

Louisville, KY 40223-0200

 

Court Documents

SMALL CLAIMS STATEMENT OF CLAIM

05/11/2021: SMALL CLAIMS STATEMENT OF CLAIM

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

05/11/2021: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA) ISSUED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-MAIL

05/19/2021: SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA) ISSUED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-MAIL

SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA) ISSUED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-MAIL

05/19/2021: SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA) ISSUED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-MAIL

SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR SERVED

05/25/2021: SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR SERVED

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE CASE

06/25/2021: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE CASE

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/04/2021
  • HearingPast Court Schedule: Time: 09:00 AM; Judge: KELLY INGRAM; Matter Type: PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE; Result: CR: PRETRIAL CONF CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketCR: PRETRIAL CONF CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketCAL:PRETRIAL CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • Docket(#5) SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketORIGINAL DISPOSITION UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR SERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: S195370; Party: P 1; Memo: EFILING # 126603544; Event Description: PMT: ISSUE COUNTY SUMMONS; Amount: $10.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: TEAL BROOKE E

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: S195370; Party: P 1; Memo: EFILING # 126603544; Event Description: PMT: SMALL CLAIMS > 2501-5000; Amount: $300.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: TEAL BROOKE E

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA) ISSUED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA) ISSUED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • ChargeComplaints: Cause of Action: CONTRACT & INDEBT 2501 - 5000; Disposition Date: 06/29/2021; Disposition Description: DISPOSED BY OTHER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • DocketORIGINAL FILING UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • DocketASM: ISSUE COUNTY SUMMONS; Amount: 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • DocketASM: SMALL CLAIMS > 2501-5000; Amount: 300.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) SMALL CLAIMS STATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: SMALL CLAIMS; Judge: JUDITH E ATKIN; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Jefferson Capital Systems LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer TEAL, BROOKE ELIZABETH