This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 04/11/2020 at 10:14:43 (UTC).

JAMES MILEY VS COURTNEY MAIER

Case Summary

On 10/11/2019 JAMES MILEY filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against COURTNEY MAIER. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are LESLIE J CASTALDI and DAVID E. SILVERMAN. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    10/11/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Brevard County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

LESLIE J CASTALDI

DAVID E. SILVERMAN

 

Party Details

Petitioners

MAIER COURTNEY GAIL

Merritt Island, FL 32952-7204

MILEY JAMES BAYLY

Merritt Island, FL 32952-7204

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/10/2019
  • DocketPMT: VS CLERKS DSB; Amount: -5.99

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • DocketPMT: VS CLERKS DSB FEE; Amount: -4.51

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • DocketPMT: CIVIL SUSPENSE; Amount: 10.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • DocketVITAL STATISTIC FORM GENERATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • Docket(#13) FINAL JUDGMENT OF SIMPLIFIED DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • DocketORIGINAL DISPOSITION UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • HearingPast Court Schedule: Time: 08:45 AM; Judge: LESLIE J CASTALDI; Matter Type: SIMPLIFIED DOM HEARING; Result: CR: HEARING HEARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • Docket(#12) DEMOGRAPHIC INFORMATION SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • Docket(#11) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • DocketCR: HEARING HEARD

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 10/11/2019
  • Docket(#7) ATTESTATION REGARDING READING ADMINISTRATIVE ORDERS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • DocketMARITAL SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • Docket(#3) MARITAL SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • DocketCOMPLAINT OR PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • Docket(#2) COMPLAINT OR PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • Docket(#1) COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: SIMPLIFIED DISSOLUTION; Judge: DAVID E. SILVERMAN; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less