This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 08/09/2020 at 11:46:01 (UTC).

JAMES A MILLMAN

Case Summary

On 01/31/2020 JAMES A MILLMAN was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Brevard County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

 

Party Details

Trustee

MISURACA BARBARA M

Indialantic, FL 32903-4757

Decedents

MILLMAN JAMES A

MILLMAN JAMES ALAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

EDWARD L STAHLEY PA

150-D Fortenberry Rd

Merritt Island, FL 32952-3681

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/09/2020
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: S163527; Party: TR 1; Event Description: PMT: NOTICE OF TRUST; Amount: $41.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: EDWARD L STAHLEY PA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • ChargeComplaints: Cause of Action: NOTICE OF TRUST; Disposition Date: 02/05/2020; Disposition Description: ADMIN PROCEEDING DISPOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF TRUST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • DocketNON SRS FILING DISPO UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • DocketNON SRS FILING ACTION UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • DocketASM: NOTICE OF TRUST; Amount: 41.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • Docket(#2) RECEIPT FOR SAFEKEEPING WILL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • ChargeComplaints: Cause of Action: SAFEKEEPING WILL; Disposition Date: 01/31/2020; Disposition Description: ADMIN PROCEEDING DISPOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketNON SRS FILING DISPO UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • Docket(#1) WILL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketNON SRS FILING ACTION UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less