This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 08/23/2020 at 06:36:19 (UTC).

JAKE ROACH VS KEVIN KIMBRO

Case Summary

On 01/31/2020 JAKE ROACH filed an Other lawsuit against KEVIN KIMBRO. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DAVID DUGAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Brevard County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DAVID DUGAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ROACH JAKE

Defendant

KIMBRO KEVIN

Melbourne, FL 32935-3667

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LIOTTA SCOTT JERRY

7335 W Sand Lake Road Suite 300

Orlando, FL 32819

Defendant Attorneys

LENTINI MICHAEL R

390 N Orange Ave Ste 895

Orlando, FL 32801-1635

CRANTON F CAROLINE H

390 N Orange Ave Ste 895

Orlando, FL 32801-1635

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

08/03/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

REQUEST FOR COPIES

06/17/2020: REQUEST FOR COPIES

NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY

06/09/2020: NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

05/06/2020: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

04/07/2020: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

03/24/2020: RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

03/11/2020: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

03/11/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

03/11/2020: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

03/11/2020: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

02/05/2020: SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

01/31/2020: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

01/31/2020: COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

COVER SHEET

01/31/2020: COVER SHEET

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/18/2020
  • Docket(#18) MOTION TO DISQUALIFY ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) REQUEST FOR COPIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE OR REQUEST FOR PHYSICAL EXAMINATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • Docket(#12) RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • Docket(#10) RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 02/08/2020
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: S163417; Party: P 1; Event Description: PMT: CIRCUIT CIVIL FILING FEE; Amount: $401.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: SOCTT J LIOTTA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • ChargeComplaints: Cause of Action: AUTO NEGLIGENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketORIGINAL FILING UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketASM: ISSUE CIRCUIT SUMMONS; Amount: 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketASM: CIRCUIT CIVIL FILING FEE; Amount: 401.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: AUTO NEGLIGENCE; Judge: DAVID DUGAN; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less