This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 11/28/2020 at 00:38:56 (UTC).

JACK HISEY VS SUSAN HISEY

Case Summary

On 09/17/2020 JACK HISEY filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against SUSAN HISEY. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are J ATKIN -GM L CASTALDI and JUDITH E ATKIN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    09/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Brevard County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

J ATKIN -GM L CASTALDI

JUDITH E ATKIN

 

Party Details

Petitioner

HISEY JACK

Melbourne, FL 32904-8021

Respondent

HISEY SUSAN

Melbourne, FL 32904-8021

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

HOPWOOD BILLIE JO

175 E Nasa Blvd Ste 300

Melbourne, FL 32901-1998

Respondent Attorney

OGDEN EMILY A

319 Riveredge Blvd, Ste 107

Cocoa, FL 32923-0009

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/16/2020
  • HearingCourt Schedule: Court Time: 11:00 AM; Event Description: CAL:HEARING; Court Room Description: MOORE JUSTICE CENTER; Judge Name: JUDITH E ATKIN; User: ajg90

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • DocketCAL:HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • Docket(#19) SUGGESTION OF DEATH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • Docket(#18) RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • Docket(#17) CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE WITH MANDATORY DISCLOSURE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • Docket(#16) DOMESTIC RELATIONS FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • Docket(#15) REPLY ANSWER OR RESPONSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2020
  • Docket(#14) ATTESTATION REGARDING READING ADMINISTRATIVE ORDERS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • HearingPast Court Schedule: Time: 08:45 AM; Judge: JUDITH E ATKIN; Matter Type: HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • DocketCAL:HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 09/17/2020
  • DocketASM: DOM FILING FEE; Amount: 409.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • Docket(#7) ATTESTATION REGARDING READING ADMINISTRATIVE ORDERS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • Docket(#4) REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • Docket(#3) MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RELIEF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • Docket(#2) PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • Docket(#1) COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE; Judge: J ATKIN -GM L CASTALDI; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less