This case was last updated from Eighteenth Circuit Courts - Brevard County on 11/28/2021 at 11:20:25 (UTC).

J ROBERTS VS M HAWK ET AL

Case Summary

On 09/17/2021 J ROBERTS filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against M HAWK. This case was filed in Eighteenth Circuit Courts - Brevard County, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DAVID DUGAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    09/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DAVID DUGAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ROBERTS JOSHUA

Defendants

HAWK MICAH

Cocoa, FL 32926-3329

KEESEE MELISSA

Cocoa, FL 32926-3329

WESCO INSURANCE COMPANY

200 E Gaines St, C/O Chief Financial Officer Ra

Tallahassee, FL 32399-6502

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GILLENWATER GRANT R

940 S Harbor City Blvd

Melbourne, FL 32901-1909

Defendant Attorney

MCGRANE MILES A 4

3440 Hollywood Blvd Second Floor

Hollywood, FL 33021-6927

 

Court Documents

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

09/17/2021: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

09/17/2021: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

09/20/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

09/17/2021: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

09/17/2021: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

09/17/2021: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

09/17/2021: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

09/17/2021: COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

09/17/2021: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/16/2021
  • Docket(#25) REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • Docket(#24) NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • Docket(#23) NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • Docket(#20) ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • Docket(#2) ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 21-24 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WESCO INSURANCE COMPANY A DELAWARE CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GILLENWATER GRANT R