This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 06/03/2023 at 23:03:43 (UTC).

J PIMIENTO VS UNIVERSAL PROP

Case Summary

On 11/23/2022 J PIMIENTO filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against UNIVERSAL PROP. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GEORGE T PAULK. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    11/23/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GEORGE T PAULK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PIMIENTO JORGE

Defendant

UNIVERSAL PROPERTY CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SPELLMAN JAUNET

Defendant Attorneys

LEVINS ELIZABETH

MCDONALD MICHAEL A

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

11/23/2022: COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

11/23/2022: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

11/23/2022: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

11/23/2022: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

11/28/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM ATTORNEY OF RECORD

12/01/2022: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM ATTORNEY OF RECORD

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

12/07/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

12/21/2022: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

05/01/2023: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • Docket(#12) RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM ATTORNEY OF RECORD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE OF ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • FinancialPayments; Receipt: S234806; Party: P 1; Memo: EFILING # 161787441; Event Description: PMT: ISSUE CIRCUIT SUMMONS; Amount: $10.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: LOW DAVID

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • FinancialPayments; Receipt: S234806; Party: P 1; Memo: EFILING # 161787441; Event Description: PMT: CIRCUIT CIVIL FILING FEE; Amount: $401.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: LOW DAVID

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • ChargeComplaints; Cause of Action: INSURANCE CLAIM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 11/23/2022
  • DocketASM: ISSUE CIRCUIT SUMMONS; Amount: 10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • DocketASM: CIRCUIT CIVIL FILING FEE; Amount: 401.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • Docket(#6) ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 21-24 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • Docket(#5) ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 21-24 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • DocketJudge History; Case Type: INSURANCE CLAIM; Judge: GEORGE T PAULK; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less