This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 03/15/2023 at 13:02:57 (UTC).

J PALLAY VS STATE FARM FLORIDA

Case Summary

On 11/28/2022 J PALLAY filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against STATE FARM FLORIDA. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CURT JACOBUS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    11/28/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CURT JACOBUS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PALLAY JOE

Defendant

STATE FARM FLORIDA INSURANCE COMPANY

200 E Gaines St

Tallahassee, FL 32399-6502

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BERGES OTTO

1665 Palm Beach Lakes Blvd Ste 1001

West Palm Beach, FL 33401-2109

Defendant Attorney

WESEMAN MELANIE S

1475 Centrepark Blvd Ste 275

West Palm Beach, FL 33401-7446

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

11/28/2022: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

11/28/2022: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

11/28/2022: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

11/29/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

11/28/2022: COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

12/20/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

NOTICE OF ATTORNEY DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

12/20/2022: NOTICE OF ATTORNEY DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

02/13/2023: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

02/16/2023: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

PRIVILEGE LOG

02/16/2023: PRIVILEGE LOG

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) PRIVILEGE LOG

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2023
  • Docket(#17) RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2023
  • Docket(#15) RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • Docket(#13) ORDER EXTENDING TIME

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • Docket(#12) MOTION FOR EXTENSION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • Docket(#11) MOTION FOR EXTENSION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE OF ATTORNEY DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketASM: ISSUE CIRCUIT SUMMONS; Amount: 10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketASM: CIRCUIT CIVIL FILING FEE; Amount: 401.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • Docket(#5) ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 21-24 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • Docket(#4) ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 21-24 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketJudge History; Case Type: INSURANCE CLAIM; Judge: CURT JACOBUS; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less