This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 06/26/2020 at 10:16:00 (UTC).

J M ALSEPT VS R B ALSEPT

Case Summary

On 01/31/2020 J M ALSEPT filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against R B ALSEPT. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is C SERRANO-GM K SMITH-RODRIGUEZ. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Brevard County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

C SERRANO-GM K SMITH-RODRIGUEZ

 

Party Details

Petitioner

ALSEPT JAMES M

Melbourne, FL 32901-8433

Respondent

ALSEPT ROBYN B

Melbourne, FL 32904-4912

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/21/2020
  • DocketDSB: REFUND; Amount: 10.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • DocketASM: CIVIL SUSPENSE; Amount: -10.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • DocketPMT: REFUND; Amount: -10.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • DocketPMT: CIVIL SUSPENSE; Amount: 10.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • Docket(#6) RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketORIGINAL DISPOSITION UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • Docket(#4) RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • ChargeComplaints: Cause of Action: DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE; Disposition Date: 02/18/2020; Disposition Description: DISMISSED BEFORE HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: E822431; Party: PT 1; Event Description: PMT: ISSUE CIRCUIT SUMMONS; Amount: $10.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: ALSEPT JAMES M

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: E822431; Party: PT 1; Event Description: PMT: DOM FILING FEE; Amount: $409.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: ALSEPT JAMES M

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • Docket(#1) PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketORIGINAL FILING UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketASM: ISSUE CIRCUIT SUMMONS; Amount: 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketASM: DOM FILING FEE; Amount: 409.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE; Judge: C SERRANO-GM K SMITH-RODRIGUEZ; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less