This case was last updated from Eighteenth Circuit Courts - Brevard County on 10/19/2021 at 07:24:16 (UTC).

J LEBRON VS FLORIDA PENINSULA

Case Summary

On 06/07/2021 J LEBRON filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against FLORIDA PENINSULA. This case was filed in Eighteenth Circuit Courts - Brevard County, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CURT JACOBUS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    06/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CURT JACOBUS

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

LEBRON JEANETTE

LEBRON PETER

Defendant

FLORIDA PENINSULA INSURANCE COMPANY

C/O Florida Chief Financial Office Ra, Po Box 6200

Tallahassee, FL 32301-6200

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

CANAURA JOSE M

2101 W Commercial Blvd Ste 2800

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33309-3070

LOW DAVID

2101 W Commercial Blvd Ste 2800

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33309-3070

Defendant Attorneys

RUBINSTEIN RINAT S

HORWITZ ROBERT S

1801 Centrepark Dr E Ste 200

West Palm Beach, FL 33401-7427

 

Court Documents

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

08/02/2021: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

NOTICE OF ATTORNEY DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

08/02/2021: NOTICE OF ATTORNEY DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

ORDER/NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER REQUIREMENT

07/28/2021: ORDER/NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER REQUIREMENT

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

07/13/2021: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

07/13/2021: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

06/15/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

06/07/2021: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

06/07/2021: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

COMPLAINT OR PETITION

06/07/2021: COMPLAINT OR PETITION

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

06/07/2021: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/15/2021
  • Docket(#21) ORDER EXTENDING TIME

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • Docket(#20) NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2021
  • Docket(#19) ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 21-24 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • Docket(#18) NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • Docket(#17) MOTION FOR EXTENSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • Docket(#16) ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 21-24 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • Docket(#15) MOTION FOR EXTENSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • Docket(#14) ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 21-24 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 06/07/2021
  • ChargeComplaints: Cause of Action: CONTRACT & INDEBTEDNESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketORIGINAL FILING UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketASM: ISSUE CIRCUIT SUMMONS; Amount: 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketASM: CIRCUIT CIVIL FILING FEE; Amount: 401.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT OR PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: CONTRACT & INDEBTEDNESS; Judge: CURT JACOBUS; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Florida Peninsula Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CANAURA JOSE M

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Low, David, ESQ.