This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 08/11/2020 at 06:48:20 (UTC).

J L CARR VS A CARR

Case Summary

On 01/31/2020 J L CARR filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against A CARR. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are M NABERHAUS-GM K SMITH-RODRIGU, KRISTEN SMITH-RODRIGUEZ and J ATKIN-GM K SMITH-RODRIGUEZ. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Brevard County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

M NABERHAUS-GM K SMITH-RODRIGU

KRISTEN SMITH-RODRIGUEZ

J ATKIN-GM K SMITH-RODRIGUEZ

 

Party Details

Petitioners

CARR JAMIE LYNN

Melbourne, FL 32935-5030

STATE OF FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE

420 N Wickham Rd Ste A

Melbourne, FL 32935-8664

SPEARS JAMIE LYNN

Melbourne, FL 32935-5030

Respondent

CARR ANDREW DOC Number - N80535

Titusville, FL 32780-9999

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

CLARKE DEBRA A

1038 Harvin Way Ste 100

Rockledge, FL 32955-3254

CASTRO HERNAN

1535 Cogswell St Ste A5

Rockledge, FL 32955-2751

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/10/2020
  • DocketVITAL STATISTIC FORM GENERATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • Docket(#26) FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE WITH SUPPORT RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • DocketORIGINAL DISPOSITION UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • Docket(#25) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • DocketRSGN: CASELOAD REASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE; Judge: J ATKIN-GM K SMITH-RODRIGUEZ; Description: RSGN: CASELOAD REASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • HearingPast Court Schedule: Time: 11:30 AM; Judge: KRISTEN SMITH-RODRIGUEZ; Matter Type: NON JURY TRIAL; Result: CR: NON JURY TRIAL CONDUCTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • DocketCR: NON JURY TRIAL CONDUCTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • DocketCAL:NON JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • Docket(#24) ORDER SETTING TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
25 More Docket Entries
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketASM: DOM FILING FEE; Amount: 409.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • Docket(#7) CIVIL APPLICATION FOR INDIGENT STATUS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • Docket(#6) PARENTING PLAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • Docket(#5) PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • Docket(#4) ATTESTATION REGARDING READING ADMINISTRATIVE ORDERS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • Docket(#3) CIVIL APPLICATION FOR INDIGENT STATUS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • Docket(#2) CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE WITH MANDATORY DISCLOSURE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • Docket(#1) DOMESTIC RELATIONS FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE; Judge: M NABERHAUS-GM K SMITH-RODRIGU; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less