This case was last updated from Eighteenth Circuit Courts - Brevard County on 01/22/2022 at 01:31:03 (UTC).

J G WENTWORTH VS ALLSTATE

Case Summary

On 09/30/2021 J G WENTWORTH filed a Contract - Business lawsuit against ALLSTATE. This case was filed in Eighteenth Circuit Courts - Brevard County, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DAVID DUGAN. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    09/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Business

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DAVID DUGAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

J G WENTWORTH ORIGINATIONS LLC

K R

Defendants

ALLSTATE ASSIGNMENT COMPANY

ALLSTATE LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PETITT RICHARD T

1646 W Snow Ave Ste 11

Tampa, FL 33606-2837

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT OR PETITION

09/30/2021: COMPLAINT OR PETITION

NOTICE OF HEARING

10/06/2021: NOTICE OF HEARING

AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING

10/06/2021: AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING

ORDER GRANTING MOTION OR PETITION

11/05/2021: ORDER GRANTING MOTION OR PETITION

NOTICE OF FILING

11/11/2021: NOTICE OF FILING

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketORIGINAL DISPOSITION UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER GRANTING MOTION OR PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • HearingPast Court Schedule: Time: 01:30 PM; Judge: DAVID DUGAN; Matter Type: HEARING; Result: CR: HEARING HEARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • DocketCR: HEARING HEARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • DocketCAL:HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: S205451; Party: P 1; Memo: EFILING # 135697471; Event Description: PMT: CIRCUIT CIVIL FILING FEE; Amount: $401.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: PETITT RICHARD T

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • ChargeComplaints: Cause of Action: BUSINESS TRANSACTION; Disposition Date: 11/05/2021; Disposition Description: DISPOSED BY JUDGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketORIGINAL FILING UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketASM: CIRCUIT CIVIL FILING FEE; Amount: 401.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • Docket(#2) ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 21-24 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT OR PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: BUSINESS TRANSACTION; Judge: DAVID DUGAN; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ALLSTATE is a litigant

Latest cases where ALLSTATE LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where J. G. Wentworth Originations LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Petitt, Richard Thomas