This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 08/15/2020 at 07:08:46 (UTC).

J C VS PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN

Case Summary

On 01/29/2020 J C filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHELLE NABERHAUS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    01/29/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    Brevard County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MICHELLE NABERHAUS

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

C J

COOK JAMES

Defendant

PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

200 E Gaines St

Tallahassee, FL 32301-2413

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MCCARVILLE RYAN

940 S Harbor City Blvd

Melbourne, FL 32901-1909

Defendant Attorney

COGSDALE STEFANI NORRBIN

901 N Lake Destiny Rd Ste 105

Maitland, FL 32751-4808

 

Court Documents

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

03/16/2020: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

03/16/2020: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

03/16/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

03/16/2020: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

02/12/2020: RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

02/03/2020: SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

01/29/2020: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

01/29/2020: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

01/29/2020: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

COVER SHEET

01/29/2020: COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

01/29/2020: COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/06/2020
  • DocketRSGN: CASELOAD REASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: INSURANCE CLAIM; Judge: MICHELLE NABERHAUS; Description: RSGN: CASELOAD REASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • Docket(#13) RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: S163174; Party: P 1; Event Description: PMT: ISSUE CIRCUIT SUMMONS; Amount: $10.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: RYAN WILLIAM MCCARVILL

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 01/29/2020
  • DocketORIGINAL FILING UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • DocketASM: ISSUE CIRCUIT SUMMONS; Amount: 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • DocketASM: CIRCUIT CIVIL FILING FEE; Amount: 401.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: INSURANCE CLAIM; Judge: JAMES H EARP; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less