This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 05/07/2020 at 09:50:30 (UTC).

IRVING BOSWELL III VS ARMED

Case Summary

On 11/05/2019 IRVING BOSWELL III filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ARMED. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GEORGE T PAULK. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    11/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Brevard County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GEORGE T PAULK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BOSWELL IRVING III

Defendant

ARMED FORCES INSURANCE EXCHANGE

200 E Gaines St, Co Chief Financial Officer Ra

Tallahassee, FL 32399-6502

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KRAPF GRANT W

2790 Sunset Point Rd

Clearwater, FL 33759-1503

Defendant Attorney

HALL JASON D

401 E Jackson St Ste 3400

Tampa, FL 33602-5874

 

Court Documents

REPLY ANSWER OR RESPONSE

03/16/2020: REPLY ANSWER OR RESPONSE

NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY

03/01/2020: NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

02/07/2020: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

PRIVILEGE LOG

02/06/2020: PRIVILEGE LOG

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

02/06/2020: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

01/22/2020: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

PRIVILEGE LOG

01/22/2020: PRIVILEGE LOG

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

01/06/2020: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

12/02/2019: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

NOTICE OF ATTORNEY DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

12/02/2019: NOTICE OF ATTORNEY DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

12/02/2019: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE BY THE INSURANCE COMMISSIONER OF THE STATE OF FLORIDA

11/11/2019: ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE BY THE INSURANCE COMMISSIONER OF THE STATE OF FLORIDA

SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

11/06/2019: SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

11/05/2019: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

11/05/2019: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

11/05/2019: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

11/05/2019: COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/02/2020
  • Docket(#26) NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) REPLY ANSWER OR RESPONSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • Docket(#24) NOTICE OF OBJECTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) PRIVILEGE LOG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • Docket(#20) RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) PRIVILEGE LOG

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 11/05/2019
  • DocketORIGINAL FILING UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • DocketASM: ISSUE CIRCUIT SUMMONS; Amount: 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • DocketASM: CIRCUIT CIVIL FILING FEE; Amount: 401.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • Docket(#5) CORRESPONDENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: CONTRACT & INDEBTEDNESS; Judge: GEORGE T PAULK; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less