This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 08/04/2020 at 06:21:53 (UTC).

IRMGARD DIERS VS MARIA NICHOLS

Case Summary

On 01/31/2020 IRMGARD DIERS filed an Other lawsuit against MARIA NICHOLS. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHELLE NABERHAUS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Brevard County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MICHELLE NABERHAUS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DIERS IRMGARD

Defendant

NICHOLS MARIA

Palm Bay, FL 32904

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GILLENWATER GRANT R

940 S Harbor City Blvd

Melbourne, FL 32901-1909

Defendant Attorney

LAMARRE ANGEL J

390 N Orange Ave Ste 895

Orlando, FL 32801-1635

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

02/28/2020: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

REPLY ANSWER OR RESPONSE

02/28/2020: REPLY ANSWER OR RESPONSE

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

01/31/2020: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

02/05/2020: SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

01/31/2020: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

01/31/2020: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

01/31/2020: COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

01/31/2020: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

COVER SHEET

01/31/2020: COVER SHEET

NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY

03/06/2020: NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

02/28/2020: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

02/28/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

INTERROGATORIES

01/31/2020: INTERROGATORIES

RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

02/13/2020: RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/21/2020
  • Docket(#31) AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • Docket(#30) AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • DocketRSGN: CASELOAD REASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: AUTO NEGLIGENCE; Judge: MICHELLE NABERHAUS; Description: RSGN: CASELOAD REASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • Docket(#29) SUPPLEMENTAL RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) REPLY ANSWER OR RESPONSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • Docket(#27) NOTICE OF OBJECTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

    Read MoreRead Less
27 More Docket Entries
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: AUTO NEGLIGENCE; Judge: JAMES H EARP; Description: RSGN: PROGRAM/CLERK PROBLEM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: AUTO NEGLIGENCE; Judge: PRESIDING JUDGE DIVISION T; Description: RSGN: CASELOAD REASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: AUTO NEGLIGENCE; Judge: JAMES H EARP; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less