Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 02/24/2021 at 17:48:36 (UTC).

HELEN VASQUEZ

Case Summary

On 01/31/2020 HELEN VASQUEZ was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHELLE A BAKER. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Brevard County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MICHELLE A BAKER

 

Party Details

Petitioner

MEJIAS ALICE

Melbourne, FL 32940-5920

Decedent

VASQUEZ HELEN

Melbourne, FL 32940-5920

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

STOLZ KAITLIN J

1696 W Hibiscus Blvd Ste A

Melbourne, FL 32901-2638

Other Attorneys

VAN FOSSEN AMY B

1696 W Hibiscus Blvd Ste A

Melbourne, FL 32901-2638

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/15/2020
  • DocketORIGINAL DISPOSITION UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • Docket(#10) ORDER FOR SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • Docket(#9) ORDER ADMITTING WILL RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE OF FILING DEATH CERTIFICATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • Docket(#7) WAIVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: S163231; Party: PT 1; Event Description: PMT: SUMMARY ADMIN $1000+; Amount: $345.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: AMY B VAN FOSSEN PA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • ChargeComplaints: Cause of Action: SUMMARY ADMIN $1000 OR GREATER; Disposition Date: 10/15/2020; Disposition Description: CP/MH DISPOSED BEFORE HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketORIGINAL FILING UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketASM: SUMMARY ADMIN $1000+; Amount: 345.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • Docket(#6) AFFIDAVIT OF NO FLORIDA ESTATE TAX DUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING RULE 2.420 FLORIDA RULES OF JUDICIAL ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • Docket(#4) DEATH CERTIFICATE - FLORIDA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • Docket(#3) PETITION FOR SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: PROBATE; Judge: MICHELLE A BAKER; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • Docket(#2) RECEIPT FOR SAFEKEEPING WILL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • ChargeComplaints: Cause of Action: SAFEKEEPING WILL; Disposition Date: 07/19/2019; Disposition Description: ADMIN PROCEEDING DISPOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • DocketNON SRS FILING DISPO UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • DocketNON SRS FILING ACTION UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • Docket(#1) WILL

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer AMY B VAN FOSSEN PA