This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 07/30/2020 at 10:02:52 (UTC).

HEALTH IMAGING VS ALLSTATE

Case Summary

On 01/31/2020 HEALTH IMAGING filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ALLSTATE. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DAVID E. SILVERMAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Brevard County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DAVID E. SILVERMAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

HEALTH IMAGING SERVICES LLC

JOSHI BHARATBHUSHAN

Defendant

ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MCCORMICK PHILIP A

2210 Central Ave Ste 300

Saint Petersburg, FL 33712-1257

Defendant Attorney

MORRELL PAULA

390 N Orange Ave Ste 895

Orlando, FL 32801-1635

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

04/01/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA) ISSUED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-MAIL

02/05/2020: SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA) ISSUED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-MAIL

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

01/31/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

01/31/2020: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

01/31/2020: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

SMALL CLAIMS STATEMENT OF CLAIM

01/31/2020: SMALL CLAIMS STATEMENT OF CLAIM

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/26/2020
  • Docket(#11) RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • Docket(#10) RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • Docket(#9) MOTION TO DISMISS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • HearingPast Court Schedule: Time: 09:00 AM; Judge: DAVID E. SILVERMAN; Matter Type: PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE; Result: CR: PRETRIAL CONF CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • DocketPTC CANCELLED PER AO 20-01-B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • DocketCR: PRETRIAL CONF CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • DocketCAL:PRETRIAL CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE OF ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2020
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: S163466; Party: P 1; Event Description: PMT: ISSUE COUNTY SUMMONS; Amount: $10.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: SHUSTER SABEN LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketORIGINAL FILING UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketASM: ISSUE COUNTY SUMMONS; Amount: 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketASM: SMALL CLAIMS < 100; Amount: 55.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • Docket(#2) REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) SMALL CLAIMS STATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: SMALL CLAIMS; Judge: DAVID E. SILVERMAN; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less