This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 09/16/2022 at 19:08:16 (UTC).

HEALTH FIRST VS UNITED

Case Summary

On 05/19/2022 HEALTH FIRST filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against UNITED. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are RHONDA E. BABB and THOMAS JAMES BROWN. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    05/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

RHONDA E. BABB

THOMAS JAMES BROWN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

HEALTH FIRST INC

CAPE CANAVERAL HOSPITAL

LEWIS TOMMIE

Defendant

UNITED SERVICES AUTOMOBILE ASSOCIATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RAKOW-SMITH PAMELA J

711 W Harvard St

Orlando, FL 32804-5201

Defendant Attorney

MILFORD MELISSA

1000 S Pine Island Rd Ste 420

Plantation, FL 33324-3905

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

05/19/2022: COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

COVER SHEET

05/19/2022: COVER SHEET

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

05/19/2022: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA) ISSUED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-MAIL

05/23/2022: SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA) ISSUED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-MAIL

ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS BY MAIL

05/25/2022: ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS BY MAIL

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

05/25/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

NOTICE OF ATTORNEY DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

05/25/2022: NOTICE OF ATTORNEY DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

06/06/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

06/09/2022: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE CASE

08/03/2022: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE CASE

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • DocketORIGINAL DISPOSITION UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • HearingPast Court Schedule: Time: 09:00 AM; Judge: THOMAS JAMES BROWN; Matter Type: PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE; Result: CR: PRETRIAL CONF CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • DocketPTC CANCELLED PER AO 20-01-B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • DocketCR: PRETRIAL CONF CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • DocketCAL:PRETRIAL CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • Docket(#13) MOTION TO DISMISS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • DocketRSGN: CASELOAD REASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: SMALL CLAIMS; Judge: THOMAS JAMES BROWN; Description: RSGN: CASELOAD REASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • Docket(#12) MOTION FOR EXTENSION

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 05/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA) ISSUED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • ChargeComplaints: Cause of Action: CONTRACT & INDEBT <100; Disposition Date: 08/03/2022; Disposition Description: DISMISSED BEFORE HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketORIGINAL FILING UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketASM: ISSUE COUNTY SUMMONS; Amount: 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketASM: SMALL CLAIMS < 100; Amount: 55.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • Docket(#3) ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 21-24 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: SMALL CLAIMS; Judge: RHONDA E. BABB; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CAPE CANAVERAL HOSPITAL is a litigant

Latest cases where HEALTH FIRST INC is a litigant

Latest cases where United Services Automobile Association is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer RAKOW-SMITH PAMELA J