This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 12/04/2022 at 13:00:34 (UTC).

HEALTH FIRST VS DIRECT GENERAL

Case Summary

On 07/25/2022 HEALTH FIRST filed an Other lawsuit against DIRECT GENERAL. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is THOMAS JAMES BROWN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    07/25/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

THOMAS JAMES BROWN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

HEALTH FIRST INC

CAPE CANAVERAL HOSPITAL

SMOOT DAICRESHIA

Defendants

DIRECT GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

200 E Gaines Street Po Box 6200, Chief Financial Officer

Tallahassee, FL 32314-6200

UNITED SERVICES AUTOMOBILE ASSOCIATION

200 E Gaines Street Po Box 6200, Chief Financial Officer

Tallahassee, FL 32314-6200

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MORRIS ROBERT

711 W Harvard Street

Orlando, FL 32804

Defendant Attorneys

MCFARLANE WILLIAM J III

210 N University Dr Flr 6

Coral Springs, FL 33071-7392

PACE MARIA

3659 Maguire Blvd Ste 151

Orlando, FL 32803-3028

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

07/25/2022: COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

COVER SHEET

07/25/2022: COVER SHEET

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

07/25/2022: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

07/25/2022: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

07/26/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

07/26/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

08/11/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

08/17/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

09/19/2022: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

10/04/2022: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

NOTICE OF HEARING

10/20/2022: NOTICE OF HEARING

NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING

11/15/2022: NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF COUNT

11/14/2022: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF COUNT

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/15/2022
  • HearingPast Court Schedule: Time: 02:30 PM; Judge: THOMAS JAMES BROWN; Matter Type: HEARING; Result: CR: HEARING CANCELLED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • DocketCR: HEARING CANCELLED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • Docket(#22) NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL SETTLEMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • DocketCAL:HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF COUNT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • Docket(#21) NOTICE OF FILING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • Docket(#20) NOTICE OF FILING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) NOTICE OF HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • Docket(#18) NOTICE OF FILING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 07/25/2022
  • ChargeComplaints: Cause of Action: COUNTY CIVIL $8001 - $15000

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • DocketASM: ISSUE COUNTY SUMMONS; Amount: 20.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • DocketORIGINAL FILING UPDATED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • DocketASM: COUNTY CIVIL FILING FEE; Amount: 300.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • Docket(#3) ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 21-24 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: COUNTY CIVIL; Judge: THOMAS JAMES BROWN; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CAPE CANAVERAL HOSPITAL is a litigant

Latest cases where HEALTH FIRST INC is a litigant

Latest cases where United Services Automobile Association is a litigant

Latest cases where Direct General Insurance Company is a litigant