This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 11/27/2022 at 02:11:09 (UTC).

HEALTH FIRST VS ALLSTATE

Case Summary

On 07/05/2022 HEALTH FIRST filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ALLSTATE. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is KELLY INGRAM. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    07/05/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

KELLY INGRAM

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

HEALTH FIRST INC

HOLMES REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER

CARRUTHERS REBECCA

Defendant

ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MORRIS ROBERT

711 W Harvard Street

Orlando, FL 32804

Defendant Attorney

LAMONTAGNE RACHEL M

200 S Biscayne Blvd Ste 4100

Miami, FL 33131-2398

 

Court Documents

SMALL CLAIMS STATEMENT OF CLAIM

07/05/2022: SMALL CLAIMS STATEMENT OF CLAIM

COVER SHEET

07/05/2022: COVER SHEET

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

07/05/2022: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA) ISSUED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-MAIL

07/06/2022: SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA) ISSUED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-MAIL

ORDER CANCELLING HEARING OR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

08/24/2022: ORDER CANCELLING HEARING OR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

09/07/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

NOTICE OR CERTIFICATE OF NON-OBJECTION

09/21/2022: NOTICE OR CERTIFICATE OF NON-OBJECTION

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

09/21/2022: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/01/2022
  • Docket(#12) MOTION FOR EXTENSION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • Docket(#9) REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE OR CERTIFICATE OF NON-OBJECTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • Docket(#7) MOTION FOR EXTENSION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2022
  • HearingPast Court Schedule: Time: 09:00 AM; Judge: KELLY INGRAM; Matter Type: PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE; Result: CR: PRETRIAL CONF CANCELLED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2022
  • DocketCR: PRETRIAL CONF CANCELLED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2022
  • DocketCAL:PRETRIAL CONFERENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 07/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA) ISSUED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • ChargeComplaints: Cause of Action: CONTRACT & INDEBT 1001 - 1500

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • DocketORIGINAL FILING UPDATED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • DocketASM: ISSUE COUNTY SUMMONS; Amount: 10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • DocketASM: SMALL CLAIMS 1001 < 1500; Amount: 175.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • Docket(#3) ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 21-24 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) SMALL CLAIMS STATEMENT OF CLAIM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: SMALL CLAIMS; Judge: KELLY INGRAM; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HOLMES REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER is a litigant

Latest cases where HEALTH FIRST INC is a litigant

Latest cases where Allstate Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MORRIS ROBERT