This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 01/02/2023 at 15:00:34 (UTC).

HEALING HANDS VS ENTERPRISE

Case Summary

On 10/31/2022 HEALING HANDS filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ENTERPRISE. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is KELLY INGRAM. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    10/31/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

KELLY INGRAM

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

HEALING HANDS CHIROPRACTIC WELLNESS CENTER LLC

AWO CHIROPRACTIC INJURY CENTER

JOHNSON ANTONIO

Defendant

ENTERPRISE LEASING COMPANY FLORIDA LLC

P O Box 6200, C/O Floria Chief Financial Officer

Tallahassee, FL 32314-6200

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KASPER CHRISTOPHER R

4800 N Federal Hwy Ste D204

Boca Raton, FL 33431-3413

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

10/31/2022: COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

10/31/2022: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

10/31/2022: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

10/31/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA) ISSUED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-MAIL

11/02/2022: SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA) ISSUED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-MAIL

ORDER CANCELLING HEARING OR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

11/14/2022: ORDER CANCELLING HEARING OR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/07/2022
  • HearingPast Court Schedule; Time: 09:00 AM; Judge: KELLY INGRAM; Matter Type: PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE; Result: CR: PRETRIAL CONF CANCELLED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • DocketCR: PRETRIAL CONF CANCELLED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • DocketCAL:PRETRIAL CONFERENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER CANCELLING HEARING OR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • FinancialPayments; Receipt: S233438; Party: P 1; Memo: EFILING # 160343482; Event Description: PMT: ISSUE COUNTY SUMMONS; Amount: $10.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: KASPER CHRISTOPHER R

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • FinancialPayments; Receipt: S233438; Party: P 1; Memo: EFILING # 160343482; Event Description: PMT: SMALL CLAIMS < 100; Amount: $55.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: KASPER CHRISTOPHER R

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA) ISSUED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • ChargeComplaints; Cause of Action: OTHER COUNTY CIVIL < 100

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • DocketORIGINAL FILING UPDATED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • DocketASM: ISSUE COUNTY SUMMONS; Amount: 10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • DocketASM: SMALL CLAIMS < 100; Amount: 55.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • Docket(#3) REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • DocketJudge History; Case Type: SMALL CLAIMS; Judge: KELLY INGRAM; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HEALING HANDS CHIROPRACTIC WELLNESS CENTER LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Enterprise Leasing Company of Florida LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KASPER, CHRISTOPHER R, Esquire