This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 05/05/2023 at 23:00:46 (UTC).

H PETERSEN VS FL TITUSVILLE LL

Case Summary

On 11/22/2022 H PETERSEN filed an Other lawsuit against FL TITUSVILLE LL. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SCOTT BLAUE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    11/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SCOTT BLAUE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HERMAN PETERSEN ESTATE

Defendants

FL TITUSVILLE LLC

EPONA HEALTH SERVICES LLC

AIRAMID HEALTH SERVICES LLC

AIRAMID HEALTH MANAGEMENT LLC

SYLVERAIN VANESSA

TITUSVILLE REHABILITATION NURSING CENTER

Not Yet Classified

PETERSEN JOANNE E

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Not Yet Classified Attorney

BOOTH RAINEY C J

Defendant Attorney

CHANDLER CORY L

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

11/22/2022: COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

11/22/2022: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

11/22/2022: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

11/22/2022: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

11/22/2022: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

NOTICE OF ATTORNEY DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

11/22/2022: NOTICE OF ATTORNEY DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

11/30/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

11/30/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

11/30/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

11/30/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

REPLY ANSWER OR RESPONSE

03/14/2023: REPLY ANSWER OR RESPONSE

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) REPLY ANSWER OR RESPONSE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2023
  • Docket(#13) ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 21-24 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2023
  • Docket(#12) ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 21-24 CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • Docket(#11) MOTION TO DISMISS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • Docket(#10) MOTION TO DISMISS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • Docket(#9) MOTION TO DISMISS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • DocketRSGN: CASELOAD REASSIGNMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • DocketJudge History; Case Type: NURSING HOME NEGLIGENCE; Judge: SCOTT BLAUE; Description: RSGN: CASELOAD REASSIGNMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • FinancialPayments; Receipt: S234995; Party: P 1; Memo: EFILING # 161739345; Event Description: PMT: ISSUE CIRCUIT SUMMONS; Amount: $40.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: BOOTH RAINEY C J

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • FinancialPayments; Receipt: S234995; Party: P 1; Memo: EFILING # 161739345; Event Description: PMT: CIRCUIT CIVIL FILING FEE; Amount: $401.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: BOOTH RAINEY C J

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 11/22/2022
  • DocketORIGINAL FILING UPDATED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • DocketASM: ISSUE CIRCUIT SUMMONS; Amount: 40.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • DocketASM: CIRCUIT CIVIL FILING FEE; Amount: 401.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF ATTORNEY DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • DocketJudge History; Case Type: NURSING HOME NEGLIGENCE; Judge: DAVID DUGAN; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less