This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 11/28/2020 at 14:16:40 (UTC).

H L ENGEL SR VS E ENGEL

Case Summary

On 09/17/2020 H L ENGEL SR filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against E ENGEL. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are C SERRANO-GM K SMITH-RODRIGUEZ and KRISTEN SMITH-RODRIGUEZ. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    09/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Brevard County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

C SERRANO-GM K SMITH-RODRIGUEZ

KRISTEN SMITH-RODRIGUEZ

 

Party Details

Petitioner

ENGEL HENRY LEE SR

Melbourne, FL 32935-3701

Respondent

ENGEL ELIZABETH MCCLARY

Melbourne, FL 32935-3701

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/10/2020
  • DocketPMT: VS CLERKS DSB; Amount: -5.99

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • DocketPMT: VS CLERKS DSB FEE; Amount: -4.51

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • DocketPMT: CIVIL SUSPENSE; Amount: 10.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • DocketVITAL STATISTIC FORM GENERATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • Docket(#8) FINAL JUDGMENT DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • DocketORIGINAL DISPOSITION UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2020
  • HearingPast Court Schedule: Time: 09:30 AM; Judge: KRISTEN SMITH-RODRIGUEZ; Matter Type: HEARING; Result: CR: HEARING HEARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2020
  • Docket(#7) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2020
  • DocketCR: HEARING HEARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2020
  • DocketCAL:HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 09/23/2020
  • Docket(#5) ORDER OF REFERRAL TO GENERAL MAGISTRATE SMITH-RODRIGUEZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • ChargeComplaints: Cause of Action: DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE; Disposition Date: 10/13/2020; Disposition Description: DISPOSED BY JUDGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: E831609; Party: PT 1; Event Description: PMT: DOM FILING FEE; Amount: $409.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: ENGEL HENRY LEE S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • Docket(#4) ANSWER AND WAIVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • Docket(#3) COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • Docket(#1) PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • DocketORIGINAL FILING UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • DocketASM: DOM FILING FEE; Amount: 409.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE; Judge: C SERRANO-GM K SMITH-RODRIGUEZ; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less