This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 01/09/2022 at 10:05:07 (UTC).

H F VS JALEN INGALLS

Case Summary

On 10/08/2021 H F filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against JALEN INGALLS. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is KELLY INGRAM. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    10/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

KELLY INGRAM

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

H F PARTNERSHIP LLP

WOODLAKE VILLAGE APARTMENTS

Defendant

INGALLS JALEN

Palm Bay, FL 32905

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MCCAIN RYAN R

4241 Northlake Blvd Ste B

Palm Beach Gardens, FL 33410-6235

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT OR PETITION

10/08/2021: COMPLAINT OR PETITION

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

10/08/2021: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

10/08/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING AND/OR SERVICE

10/11/2021: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING AND/OR SERVICE

RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

10/12/2021: RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK

10/21/2021: MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK

MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT

10/21/2021: MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT

AFFIDAVIT OF NON MILITARY AND PROPER VENUE

10/21/2021: AFFIDAVIT OF NON MILITARY AND PROPER VENUE

DEFAULT ENTERED

10/25/2021: DEFAULT ENTERED

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE CASE

10/28/2021: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE CASE

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • DocketORIGINAL DISPOSITION UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) DEFAULT ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) AFFIDAVIT OF NON MILITARY AND PROPER VENUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2021
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: S205900; Party: P 1; Memo: EFILING # 136196477; Event Description: PMT: ISSUE COUNTY SUMMONS; Amount: $10.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: MCCAIN RYAN R

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2021
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: S205900; Party: P 1; Memo: EFILING # 136196477; Event Description: PMT: EVICTION FILING FEE; Amount: $185.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: MCCAIN RYAN R

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CERTIFICATE OF MAILING AND/OR SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • ChargeComplaints: Cause of Action: EVICTIONS RESIDENTIAL; Disposition Date: 10/28/2021; Disposition Description: DISMISSED BEFORE HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketORIGINAL FILING UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketASM: ISSUE COUNTY SUMMONS; Amount: 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketASM: EVICTION FILING FEE; Amount: 185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT OR PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: COUNTY EVICTION; Judge: KELLY INGRAM; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where H F PARTNERSHIP LLP is a litigant

Latest cases where WOODLAKE VILLAGE APARTMENTS is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer RYAN MCCAIN