This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 07/07/2020 at 08:25:16 (UTC).

GULLHOUSE VS LCTRUST LLC

Case Summary

On 11/25/2019 GULLHOUSE filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against LCTRUST LLC. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DAVID DUGAN. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    11/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Brevard County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DAVID DUGAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GULLHOUSE III CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION INC

6355 S Highway A1A Apt 8

Melbourne Beach, FL 32951-3774

Defendants

LCTRUST LLC

1555 N Highway A1A Apt 504

Indialantic, FL 32903-2730

UNKNOWN TENANTS

Melbourne Beach, FL 32951-3773

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SPIRA STEPHEN E

4865 N Wickham Rd Ste 102

Melbourne, FL 32940-8303

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS

07/01/2020: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS

MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

02/28/2020: MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

AFFIDAVIT OF COSTS

02/28/2020: AFFIDAVIT OF COSTS

DEFAULT ENTERED

02/25/2020: DEFAULT ENTERED

MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK

02/19/2020: MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK

MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK

02/19/2020: MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK

MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK

02/19/2020: MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK

RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

01/21/2020: RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

12/04/2019: RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

12/04/2019: RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

11/27/2019: SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

11/27/2019: SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

11/25/2019: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

11/25/2019: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

LIS PENDENS RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS

11/25/2019: LIS PENDENS RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS

COMPLAINT OR PETITION

11/25/2019: COMPLAINT OR PETITION

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/07/2020
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: S173588; Party: P 1; Event Description: PMT: RECORDING TWO PAGES; Amount: $18.50; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: STEPHEN SPIRA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • DocketORIGINAL DISPOSITION UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • DocketASM: RECORDING TWO PAGES; Amount: 18.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) AFFIDAVIT OF COSTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) DEFAULT ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 11/25/2019
  • ChargeComplaints: Cause of Action: FCL-NON-HOMESTD 50,001-249,999; Disposition Date: 07/01/2020; Disposition Description: DISMISS BEFORE HRG-OTHER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketORIGINAL FILING UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketASM: ISSUE CIRCUIT SUMMONS; Amount: 20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketASM: LIS PENDENS TWO PAGES; Amount: 9.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketASM:FCL >50,000 < 250,000; Amount: 906.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) LIS PENDENS RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT OR PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: FCL-NON-HOMESTD 50001-249999; Judge: DAVID DUGAN; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less