This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 05/24/2023 at 17:06:29 (UTC).

GEORGE PORCELLA VS GEICO

Case Summary

On 02/27/2023 GEORGE PORCELLA filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against GEICO. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GEORGE T PAULK. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    02/27/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GEORGE T PAULK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PORCELLA GEORGE

Defendant

GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LENTINI MICHAEL R

Defendant Attorney

BALL CHRISTOPHER S

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

02/27/2023: COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

02/27/2023: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

02/28/2023: SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

02/27/2023: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

03/02/2023: RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

02/27/2023: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

03/21/2023: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

03/21/2023: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

NOTICE

03/21/2023: NOTICE

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

03/21/2023: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

03/21/2023: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

05/10/2023: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY

05/17/2023: NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2023
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2023
  • FinancialPayments; Receipt: S241173; Party: P 1; Memo: EFILING # 167643212; Event Description: PMT: ISSUE CIRCUIT SUMMONS; Amount: $10.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: LENTINI MICHAEL R

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 02/27/2023
  • DocketORIGINAL FILING UPDATED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • DocketASM: ISSUE CIRCUIT SUMMONS; Amount: 10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • DocketASM: CIRCUIT CIVIL FILING FEE; Amount: 401.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • Docket(#5) ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 21-24 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • Docket(#4) ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 21-24 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • DocketJudge History; Case Type: INSURANCE CLAIM; Judge: GEORGE T PAULK; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less