Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 02/25/2021 at 05:22:44 (UTC).

GALAXY VS KENISHA GUNN

Case Summary

On 02/20/2020 GALAXY filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against KENISHA GUNN. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are BENJAMIN B GARAGOZLO and JUDITH E ATKIN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    02/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Brevard County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

BENJAMIN B GARAGOZLO

JUDITH E ATKIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GALAXY INTERNATIONAL PURCHASING LLC

Defendant

GUNN KENISHA

Rockledge, FL 32955-2576

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MOORE ASHLEY L

5801 Ulmerton Rd Ste 201

Clearwater, FL 33760-3951

Defendant Attorney

CASTELLANOS J NICHOLAS

3639 Cortez Rd W Ste 130

Bradenton, FL 34210-3157

 

Court Documents

MEDIATION CONFERENCE REPORT NO AGREEMENT OR IMPASSE

12/01/2020: MEDIATION CONFERENCE REPORT NO AGREEMENT OR IMPASSE

ORDER FOR PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE

11/18/2020: ORDER FOR PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE

ORDER SETTING MEDIATION CONFERENCE

11/17/2020: ORDER SETTING MEDIATION CONFERENCE

SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR SERVED

08/21/2020: SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR SERVED

SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA) ISSUED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-MAIL

08/19/2020: SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA) ISSUED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-MAIL

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

08/17/2020: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

04/24/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

SUMMONS NTC APPEAR UNSERVED/UNEXECUTED

03/19/2020: SUMMONS NTC APPEAR UNSERVED/UNEXECUTED

NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING RULE 2.420 FLORIDA RULES OF JUDICIAL ADMINISTRATION

02/20/2020: NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING RULE 2.420 FLORIDA RULES OF JUDICIAL ADMINISTRATION

SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA) ISSUED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-MAIL

02/25/2020: SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA) ISSUED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-MAIL

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

02/20/2020: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

COMPLAINT OR PETITION

02/20/2020: COMPLAINT OR PETITION

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/13/2021
  • HearingPast Court Schedule: Time: 09:00 AM; Judge: BENJAMIN B GARAGOZLO; Matter Type: PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketCAL:PRETRIAL CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketRSGN: CASELOAD REASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: SMALL CLAIMS; Judge: JUDITH E ATKIN; Description: RSGN: CASELOAD REASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • HearingPast Court Schedule: Time: 11:30 AM; Judge: MEDIATION SMALL CLAIMS; Matter Type: MEDIATION SMALL CLAIMS; Result: CR: MEDIATION HEARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MEDIATION CONFERENCE REPORT NO AGREEMENT OR IMPASSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • DocketCR: MEDIATION HEARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • DocketCAL:MEDIATION SMALL CLAIMS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • HearingPast Court Schedule: Time: 09:00 AM; Judge: BENJAMIN B GARAGOZLO; Matter Type: PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE; Result: CR: PRETRIAL CONF CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • DocketCR: PRETRIAL CONF CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 02/26/2020
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: S165312; Party: P 1; Event Description: PMT: ISSUE COUNTY SUMMONS; Amount: $10.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: RSIEH FLORIDA COST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA) ISSUED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • ChargeComplaints: Cause of Action: CONTRACT & INDEBT 5001 - 8000

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • DocketORIGINAL FILING UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • DocketASM: ISSUE COUNTY SUMMONS; Amount: 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • DocketASM: SMALL CLAIMS $5001-$8000; Amount: 300.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING RULE 2.420 FLORIDA RULES OF JUDICIAL ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT OR PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: SMALL CLAIMS; Judge: BENJAMIN B GARAGOZLO; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GALAXY INTERNATIONAL PURCHASING, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MOORE , ASHLEY L