This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 09/13/2020 at 13:25:03 (UTC).

GAINESVILLE VS PROGRESSIVE

Case Summary

On 02/19/2020 GAINESVILLE filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against PROGRESSIVE. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHELLE A BAKER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    02/19/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Brevard County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MICHELLE A BAKER

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

GAINESVILLE HIGH FIELD MRI CENTER INC

FRALEY CHERYL

Defendant

PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

200 E Gaines St

Tallahassee, FL 32399-6502

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

LOVELANE RHAMEN M

390 N Orange Ave Ste 2100

Orlando, FL 32801-1642

 

Court Documents

PRIVILEGE LOG

04/24/2020: PRIVILEGE LOG

JUDICIAL DIRECTIVE (ACTION) ORDER

03/26/2020: JUDICIAL DIRECTIVE (ACTION) ORDER

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

03/17/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

03/17/2020: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA) ISSUED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-MAIL

02/21/2020: SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA) ISSUED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-MAIL

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

02/19/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

02/19/2020: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

02/19/2020: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

SMALL CLAIMS STATEMENT OF CLAIM

02/19/2020: SMALL CLAIMS STATEMENT OF CLAIM

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/12/2020
  • HearingPast Court Schedule: Time: 01:30 PM; Judge: MICHELLE A BAKER; Matter Type: PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE; Result: CR: PRETRIAL CONF CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • DocketPTC CANCELLED PER AO 20-01-B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • DocketCR: PRETRIAL CONF CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • DocketCAL:PRETRIAL CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • Docket(#14) ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • Docket(#13) RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) PRIVILEGE LOG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • HearingPast Court Schedule: Time: 01:30 PM; Judge: MICHELLE A BAKER; Matter Type: PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE; Result: CR: PRETRIAL CONF CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • DocketCR: PRETRIAL CONF CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • DocketCAL:PRETRIAL CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketORIGINAL FILING UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketASM: ISSUE COUNTY SUMMONS; Amount: 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketASM: SMALL CLAIMS < 100; Amount: 55.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • Docket(#2) REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) SMALL CLAIMS STATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: SMALL CLAIMS; Judge: MICHELLE A BAKER; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less