Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 02/24/2021 at 17:59:32 (UTC).

GAINESVILLE VS PROGRESSIVE

Case Summary

On 01/31/2020 GAINESVILLE filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against PROGRESSIVE. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DAVID E. SILVERMAN. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Brevard County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DAVID E. SILVERMAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

GAINESVILLE HIGH FIELD MRI CENTER INC

ROBERTS JAMES

Defendant

PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

200 E Gaines St

Tallahassee, FL 32399-6502

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MCCORMICK PHILIP A

2210 Central Ave Ste 300

Saint Petersburg, FL 33712-1257

Defendant Attorney

FLOYD BENJAMIN

901 N Lake Destiny Rd Ste 105

Maitland, FL 32751-4808

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE CASE

12/21/2020: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE CASE

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE CASE

12/15/2020: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE CASE

PRIVILEGE LOG

05/21/2020: PRIVILEGE LOG

MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

04/01/2020: MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

03/24/2020: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

MOTION TO INVOKE RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE

02/25/2020: MOTION TO INVOKE RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE

SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA) ISSUED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-MAIL

02/05/2020: SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA) ISSUED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-MAIL

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

01/31/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

01/31/2020: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

01/31/2020: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

01/31/2020: COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • DocketORIGINAL DISPOSITION UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • Docket(#18) NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • Docket(#17) AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) PRIVILEGE LOG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • Docket(#14) RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL SETTLEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2020
  • Docket(#12) RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketORIGINAL FILING UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketASM: ISSUE COUNTY SUMMONS; Amount: 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketASM: SMALL CLAIMS < 100; Amount: 55.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • Docket(#2) REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: SMALL CLAIMS; Judge: DAVID E. SILVERMAN; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GAINESVILLE HIGH FIELD MRI CENTER INC is a litigant

Latest cases where Progressive American Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FLOYD BENJAMIN