This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 08/29/2020 at 02:42:06 (UTC).

GAINESVILLE VS DIRECT GENERAL

Case Summary

On 01/31/2020 GAINESVILLE filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against DIRECT GENERAL. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHELLE A BAKER. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Brevard County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MICHELLE A BAKER

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

GAINESVILLE HIGH FIELD MRI CENTER INC

LENOIR DOMINIQUE

Defendant

DIRECT GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MCCORMICK PHILIP A

2210 Central Ave Ste 300

Saint Petersburg, FL 33712-1257

 

Court Documents

ORDER FOR PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE

04/25/2020: ORDER FOR PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE CASE

04/24/2020: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE CASE

JUDICIAL DIRECTIVE (ACTION) ORDER

03/29/2020: JUDICIAL DIRECTIVE (ACTION) ORDER

ORDER FOR PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE

03/16/2020: ORDER FOR PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE

SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA) ISSUED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-MAIL

02/05/2020: SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA) ISSUED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-MAIL

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

01/31/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

01/31/2020: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

01/31/2020: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

COMPLAINT OR PETITION

01/31/2020: COMPLAINT OR PETITION

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/23/2020
  • HearingPast Court Schedule: Time: 01:30 PM; Judge: MICHELLE A BAKER; Matter Type: PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE; Result: CR: PRETRIAL CONF CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • DocketCR: PRETRIAL CONF CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • DocketCAL:PRETRIAL CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • HearingPast Court Schedule: Time: 01:30 PM; Judge: MICHELLE A BAKER; Matter Type: PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE; Result: CR: PRETRIAL CONF CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • DocketCR: PRETRIAL CONF CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • DocketCAL:PRETRIAL CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER FOR PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • DocketORIGINAL DISPOSITION UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2020
  • HearingPast Court Schedule: Time: 01:30 PM; Judge: MICHELLE A BAKER; Matter Type: PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE; Result: CR: PRETRIAL CONF CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketORIGINAL FILING UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketASM: ISSUE COUNTY SUMMONS; Amount: 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketASM: SMALL CLAIMS < 100; Amount: 55.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • Docket(#2) REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT OR PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: SMALL CLAIMS; Judge: MICHELLE A BAKER; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less